Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789042

EP2789042 - USE OF MIXTURES OF LITHIUM SALTS AS ELECTROLYTES OF LITHIUM ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]USE OF LITHIUM SALT MIXTURES AS LI-ION BATTERY ELECTROLYTES
[2016/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arkema France
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Grégory
420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves
F-92700 Colombes / FR
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Chahine, Audrey Claire
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/51]Chahine, Audrey Claire
Arkema France
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Former [2014/42]Dang, Doris
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12808425.821.11.2012
[2016/51]
WO2012FR52681
Priority number, dateFR2011006120406.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161204
FR2012005504631.05.2012         Original published format: FR 1255046
[2014/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083894
Date:13.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789042
Date:15.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789042
Date:21.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/0568, C07D233/00, H01M10/0525, H01M10/052, C07D233/90, H01M10/0569
[2015/20]
Former International [2014/42]H01M10/0568, C07D233/00, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0569
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON MISCHUNGEN VON LITHIUMSALZEN ALS ELEKTROLYTEN VON LITHIUMIONENBATTERIEN[2016/25]
English:USE OF MIXTURES OF LITHIUM SALTS AS ELECTROLYTES OF LITHIUM ION BATTERIES[2016/25]
French:UTILISATION DE MELANGES DE SELS DE LITHIUM COMME ELECTROLYTES DE BATTERIES LI-ION[2014/42]
Former [2014/42]VERWENDUNG VON LITHIUMSALZMISCHUNGEN ALS LI-IONEN-BATTERIEELEKTROLYTEN
Former [2014/42]USE OF LITHIUM SALT MIXTURES AS LI-ION BATTERY ELECTROLYTES
Entry into regional phase18.04.2014National basic fee paid 
18.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
27.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2015Observations by third parties
02.07.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.07.2015Fee for grant paid
07.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2016Fee for grant paid
24.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15175445.4  / EP2947714
EP17197915.6  / EP3293807
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2015
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2012
AT21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
MT21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
MT21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/33]AT21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004009393  (KIM SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1,5-14 * paragraphs [0026] , [0037] , [0038] , [0044] , [0045] *;
 [X]WO2010023413  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 8, line 13 - line 37 * * page 9, line 13 - line 16 * * claims 8,10,14 *;
 [A]  - NIEDZICKI L ET AL, "Modern generation of polymer electrolytes based on lithium conductive imidazole salts", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 192, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2009.03.050, ISSN 0378-7753, (20090715), pages 612 - 617, (20090402), XP026140144 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2009.03.050
 [A]  - BEGLAND R W ET AL, "Hydrogen cyanide chemistry. VIII. New chemistry of diaminomaleonitrile. Heterocyclic synthesis", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON.; US, (19740101), vol. 39, no. 16, doi:10.1021/JO00930A004, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2341 - 2350, XP002521054 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00930a004
ExaminationUS2004106047
 JP2009129797
 US2011229769
by applicantWO2010023413
 WO2010023143
 WO2010113483
 WO2010113835
 WO2009123328
otherUS2004106047
 JP2009129797
 US2011229769