Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782782

EP2782782 - VEHICLE SURROUNDINGS MONITORING APPARATUS AND VEHICLE SURROUNDINGS MONITORING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KUMON, Hitoshi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date12808458.916.11.2012
WO2012IB02371
Priority number, dateJP2011025611024.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011256110
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076544
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782782
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782782
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00, G08G1/16, B60R1/00
[2015/02]
Former International [2014/40]B60R1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER FAHRZEUGUMGEBUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER FAHRZEUGUMGEBUNG[2014/40]
English:VEHICLE SURROUNDINGS MONITORING APPARATUS AND VEHICLE SURROUNDINGS MONITORING METHOD[2014/40]
French:APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase21.05.2014National basic fee paid 
21.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
22.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2015Fee for grant paid
07.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2014
Opposition(s)18.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.11.2012
AL17.06.2015
AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CY17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MK17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
NL17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SE17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
SM17.06.2015
TR17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU16.11.2012
AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CY17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MK17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
NL17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SE17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
SM17.06.2015
TR17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2018/31]HU16.11.2012
AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CY17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MK17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
NL17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SE17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
SM17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU16.11.2012
AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CY17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
MT17.06.2015
NL17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SE17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
SM17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/03]AT17.06.2015
BE17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
IE16.11.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/36]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SI17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
LU16.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
LU16.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
MC17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/21]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
IT17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
DK17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT17.06.2015
CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ17.06.2015
EE17.06.2015
ES17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
PL17.06.2015
RO17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
SK17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
IS17.10.2015
PT19.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE17.06.2015
FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
BG17.09.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI17.06.2015
HR17.06.2015
LT17.06.2015
LV17.06.2015
RS17.06.2015
NO17.09.2015
GR18.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2007009137  (MIYOSHI TAKASHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-7,10 * figures 4,7-9 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0153] * [A] 8,9;
 [XA]EP2219151  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,10,11 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0045] * [A] 8,9
by applicantJP2010274813
 JPS63274286