Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2776988

EP2776988 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING MEMORY IN PROBABILISTIC MANNER TO STORE SYNAPTIC WEIGHTS OF NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LV, RS
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / APARIN, Vladimir
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/16]
Former [2014/38]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12808537.006.11.2012
[2019/16]
WO2012US63719
Priority number, dateUS20111329216109.11.2011         Original published format: US201113292161
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013070612
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2776988
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2776988
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06N3/04, G06N3/063
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR PROBABILISTISCHEN NUTZUNG EINS SPEICHERS ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON SYNAPTISCHEN GEWICHTEN EINES NEURONALEN NETZWERKS[2018/45]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING MEMORY IN PROBABILISTIC MANNER TO STORE SYNAPTIC WEIGHTS OF NEURAL NETWORK[2014/38]
French:DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE À L'UTILISATION PROBABILISTE D'UNE MÉMOIRE À LA MÉMORISTION DES POIDS SYNAPTIQUES D'UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL[2018/45]
Former [2014/38]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES SPEICHERS AUF PROBABILISTISCHE WEISE ZUM SPEICHERN SYNAPTISCHER GEWICHTE EINES NEURONALEN NETZWERKES
Former [2014/38]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'UTILISER UNE MÉMOIRE DE MANIÈRE PROBABILISTE POUR STOCKER DES POIDS SYNAPTIQUES DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
18.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2018
11.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2019Fee for grant paid
05.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.04.2019
ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
LV17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
RS17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
GR18.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/49]AL17.04.2019
ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
HR17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/48]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
SE17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
PT17.08.2019
Former [2019/47]ES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL17.04.2019
Cited inInternational search[IA]WO9318474  (UNIV LONDON [GB]; KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB]) [I] 1-4,9-14,19-24,29-34,39,40 * abstract * * page 1 - page 18 * [A] 5-8,15-18,25-28,35-38;
 [IA]US3341823  (CONNELLY EDWARD M) [I] 1,11,21,31 * figures 1-3; claims 1-8 * * column 1 - column 7, paragraph 2 * [A] 2-10,12-20,22-30,32-40;
 [IP]US2012259804  (BREZZO BERNARD V [US] ET AL) [IP] 1-40 * the whole document *
 [I]  - Terry Elliott, "Discrete States of Synaptic Strength in a Stochastic Model of Spike-Timing-Dependent Plasticity", Neural Computation Vol. 22, No. 1, doi:10.1162/neco.2009.07-08-814, (20091211), pages 244 - 272, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1162/neco.2009.07-08-814, (20120327), XP055023039 [I] 1-40 * page 244 - page 270, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1162/neco.2009.07-08-814
 [I]  - GOLDBERG D H ET AL, "Analog VLSI spiking neural network with address domain probabilistic synapses", ISCAS 2001. THE 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 6 - 9 MAY 2001, SYDNEY, NSW, AUSTRALIA; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS], IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ , USA, (20010506), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ISCAS.2001.921292, ISBN 978-0-7803-6685-5, pages 241 - 244, XP010541121 [I] 1-40 * page 241 - page 244, column l, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2001.921292
 [A]  - CLARKSON T G ET AL, "pRAM automata", 19901216; 19901216 - 19901219, (19901216), pages 235 - 243, XP010010755 [A] 1-40 * page 235 - page 239, paragraph 2 *
 [XP]  - PATRYK KRZYSTECZKO ET AL, "The Memristive Magnetic Tunnel Junction as a Nanoscopic Synapse-Neuron System", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20120207), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.1002/adma.201103723, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 762 - 766, XP055054723 [XP] 1-40 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201103723