Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788855

EP2788855 - DEVICE AND METHOD OF IMPROVING THE PERCEPTUAL LUMINANCE NONLINEARITY-BASED IMAGE DATA EXCHANGE ACROSS DIFFERENT DISPLAY CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]DEVICE AND METHOD OF IMPROVING THE PERCEPTUAL LUMINANCE NONLINEARITY - BASED IMAGE DATA EXCHANGE ACROSS DIFFERENT DISPLAY CAPABILITIES
[2015/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
100 Potrero Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94103-4813 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Jon, Scott
c/o Dolby Laboratories Inc.
100 Potrero Avenue
San Francisco, California 94103-4813 / US
02 / DALY, Scott
c/o Dolby Laboratories Inc.
100 Potrero Avenue
San Francisco, California 94103-4813 / US
03 / NEZAMABADI, Mahdi
c/o Dolby Laboratories Inc.
100 Potrero Avenue
San Francisco, California 94103-4813 / US
04 / ATKINS, Robin
c/o Dolby Laboratories Inc.
100 Potrero Avenue
San Francisco, California 94103-4813 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe
Apollo Building, 3E
Herikerbergweg 1-35
1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12808594.106.12.2012
[2016/22]
WO2012US68212
Priority number, dateUS201161567579P06.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567579 P
US201261674503P23.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261674503 P
US201261703449P20.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261703449 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086169
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788855
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2788855
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/14, G09G5/00, G06T5/00, H04N19/40
[2015/48]
Former International [2014/42]G06F3/14, G09G5/00, G06T5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES BILDDATENAUSTAUSCHS AUF BASIS EINER WAHRNEHMUNGSBEZOGENEN LUMINANZNICHTLINEARITÄT ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN ANZEIGEFUNKTIONEN[2014/42]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD OF IMPROVING THE PERCEPTUAL LUMINANCE NONLINEARITY-BASED IMAGE DATA EXCHANGE ACROSS DIFFERENT DISPLAY CAPABILITIES[2015/48]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À AMÉLIORER UN ÉCHANGE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES BASÉ SUR UNE NON-LINÉARITÉ DE LUMINANCE PERCEPTUELLE À TRAVERS DIFFÉRENTES CAPACITÉS D'AFFICHAGE[2014/42]
Former [2014/42]DEVICE AND METHOD OF IMPROVING THE PERCEPTUAL LUMINANCE NONLINEARITY - BASED IMAGE DATA EXCHANGE ACROSS DIFFERENT DISPLAY CAPABILITIES
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2016Fee for grant paid
25.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16166823.1  / EP3079055
EP19155297.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2016
Opposition(s)02.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2012
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE06.12.2016
LU06.12.2016
MT06.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU06.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
TR01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE06.12.2016
LU06.12.2016
MT06.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU06.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE06.12.2016
LU06.12.2016
MT06.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU06.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE06.12.2016
LU06.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU06.12.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE06.12.2016
LU06.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
IE06.12.2016
LU06.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2311432  (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3; figures 1-2 * [Y] 2-4,6-11;
 [Y]US2003174284  (STEWART JEFFREY L [US]) [Y] 2-4,6-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1-4 *;
 [XY]EP0103488  (NEW YORK INST TECHN [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * page 1 - page 36 * [Y] 2-4,6-11;
 [XY]JP2000188647  (RICOH KK) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,6-11