Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794628

EP2794628 - 4'-AZIDO-3'-FLUORO SUBSTITUTED NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF HCV RNA REPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]4'-AZIDO, 3'-FLUORO SUBSTITUTED NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF HCV RNA REPLICATION
[2016/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Riboscience LLC
3901 Laguna Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
[2015/02]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Mark
333 Harrison Street, No. 363
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
02 / TALAMAS, Francisco Xavier
23 Westmount Drive
Livingston, NJ 07039 / US
03 / ZHANG, Jing
161 Carlton Drive
Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US
04 / ZHANG, Zhuming
59 Wesley Road
Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/13]
Former [2014/44]Meier, Jürgen
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12808791.317.12.2012
[2017/13]
WO2012EP75688
Priority number, dateUS201161577712P20.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161577712 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092447
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794628
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794628
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/10, C07H19/20, A61K31/7068, A61K31/7072
[2016/37]
Former International [2016/36]C07H19/10, C07H19/20
Former International [2014/44]C07H19/06, C07H19/16, A61K31/7072, A61K31/708, A61P31/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:4'-AZID-3'-FLUOR-SUBSTITUIERTE NUKLEOSIDDERIVATE ALS HEMMER DER HCV-RNA-REPLIKATION[2014/44]
English:4'-AZIDO-3'-FLUORO SUBSTITUTED NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF HCV RNA REPLICATION[2016/44]
French:DÉRIVÉS NUCLÉOSIDIQUES 4'-AZIDO-3'-FLUORO SUBSTITUÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA RÉPLICATION DE L'ARN DU VHC[2016/44]
Former [2014/44]4'-AZIDO, 3'-FLUORO SUBSTITUTED NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF HCV RNA REPLICATION
Former [2014/44]DÉRIVÉS NUCLÉOSIDIQUES 4'-AZIDO, 3'-FLUORO SUBSTITUÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA RÉPLICATION DE L'ARN DU VHC
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
19.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
24.03.2015Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
09.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2015Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2017Fee for grant paid
16.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
IS29.07.2017
MT17.12.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2017/51]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/50]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/43]HR29.03.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]WO02100415  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-20 * compound 29 *
 [A]  - DAVID B. SMITH ET AL, "The Design, Synthesis, and Antiviral Activity of Monofluoro and Difluoro Analogues of 4'-Azidocytidine against Hepatitis C Virus Replication: The Discovery of 4'-Azido-2'-deoxy-2'-fluorocytidine and 4'-Azido-2'-dideoxy-2',2'-difluorocytidine", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20090514), vol. 52, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jm801595c, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2971 - 2978, XP055054142 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm801595c
by applicantUS5807876
 US6498178
 US6344465
 US6054472
 WO9740028
 WO9840381
 WO0056331
 WO0204425
 WO03007945
 WO03010141
 WO03000254
 WO0132153
 WO0006529
 WO0018231
 WO0010573
 WO0013708
 WO0185172
 WO03037893
 WO03037894
 WO03037895
 WO02100851
 WO02100846
 WO9901582
 WO0009543
 WO0218369
 WO9817679
 WO9822496
 WO9907734
 WO2005073216
 WO2005073195
 WO2008021927
    - R. G. GISH, SEM. LIVER. DIS., (1999), vol. 19, page 35
    - V. LOHMANN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, pages 110 - 113
    - SMITH, DAVID B; KALAYANOV, GENADIY; SUND, CHRISTIAN; WINQVIST, ANNA; MALTSEVA, TATIANA; LEVEQUE, VINCENT J.-P; RAJYAGURU, SONAL; L, JOURNAL OF MEDICINALCHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 52, no. 9, pages 2971 - 2978
    - GOSSELIN, G. ET AL., COLLECT. CZECH. CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), vol. 71, no. 7, pages 991 - 1010
    - SMITH, D. B. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 52, no. 9, pages 2971 - 2978
    - FIESER; FIESER'S, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, WILEY & SONS, (1991), vol. 1-15
    - RODD'S, Chemistry of Carbon Compounds, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 1-5
    - Organic Reactions, WILEY & SONS, (1991), vol. 1-40
    - N. KRIEGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (2001), vol. 75, no. 10, page 4614
    - M.D. RYAN; J. DREW, EMBO, (1994), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 928 - 933