Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794568

EP2794568 - SUBSTITUTED 4-CYANO-3-PHENYL-4-(PYRIDIN-3-YL) BUTANOATES, PROCESSES FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]SUBSTITUTED 4-CYAN-3-PHENYL-4-(PYRIDINE-3-YL)BUTANOATES, PROCESSES FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS.
[2015/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Str. 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / JAKOBI, Harald
Großer Hasenpfad 80
60598 Frankfurt / DE
02 / MOSRIN, Marc
Waldschulstr. 103
65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / DIETRICH, Hansjörg
Bonifatiusstr. 1b
65835 Liederbach am Taunus / DE
04 / GATZWEILER, Elmar
Am Nauheimer Bach 22
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
05 / HÄUSER-HAHN, Isolde
Dünfelder Str. 22
51375 Leverkusen / DE
06 / HEINEMANN, Ines
Ubierstr. 13
65719 Hofheim / DE
07 / ROSINGER, Christopher, Hugh
Am Hochfeld 33
65719 Hofheim / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[2016/12]
Former [2014/44]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date12808802.817.12.2012
[2016/12]
WO2012EP75818
Priority number, dateDE2011108907119.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011089071
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092500
Date:27.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794568
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794568
Date:23.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/57, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, A01N43/40, A01P13/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 4-CYAN-3-PHENYL-4-(PYRIDIN-3-YL)BUTANOATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE UND PFLANZENWACHSTUMSREGULATOREN[2014/44]
English:SUBSTITUTED 4-CYANO-3-PHENYL-4-(PYRIDIN-3-YL) BUTANOATES, PROCESSES FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS[2015/51]
French:4-CYANO-3-PHENYL-4-(PYRIDIN-3-YL) BUTANOATES SUBSTITUÉS, PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'HERBICIDES ET RÉGULATEURS DE LA CROISSANCE DES PLANTES[2015/51]
Former [2014/44]SUBSTITUTED 4-CYAN-3-PHENYL-4-(PYRIDINE-3-YL)BUTANOATES, PROCESSES FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS.
Former [2014/44]4-CYAN-3-PHÉNYL-4-(PYRIDINE-3-YL)BUTANOATES SUBSTITUÉS, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DESDITS COMPOSÉS ET UTILISATION DESDITS COMPOSÉS COMME HERBICIDES ET RÉGULATEURS DE LA CROISSANCE DES PLANTES
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
23.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2016Fee for grant paid
20.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2015
Opposition(s)02.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2012
AL23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU17.12.2012
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU17.12.2012
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU17.12.2012
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/51]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/36]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
ES23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[ID]EP0005341  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [ID] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [ID]EP0270830  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [ID] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [ID]JPH04297455  (HOKKO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., JAPAN) [ID] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [I]  - ISHIKAWA, HIROMICHI ET AL, "Preparation of 4-heterocyclyl-3-(substituted phenyl)butyric acids as herbicides.", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1993), Database accession no. 1993:185833, URL: STN, XP002691456 [I] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantEP0005341
 EP0266725
 EP0270830
 JPH04297454
 JPH04297455
 JPH0558979
 WO2011003775
 WO2011003776
 WO2011042378
 WO2011073143
 WO2011098417
 US5225423
 US4966902
 WO2007045989
 US2004242572
 US4631211
 EP0221044
 EP0131624
 WO9211376
 WO9214827
 WO9119806
 EP0242236
 EP0242246
 WO9200377
 EP0257993
 US5013659
 EP0142924
 EP0193259
 WO9113972
 WO9107874
 EP0333131
 EP0269806
 EP0174562
 EP0346620
 WO9108202
 WO9507897
 EP0086750
 EP0094349
 EP0191736
 EP0492366
 WO0234048
 EP0582198
 WO9916744
 EP0365484
 WO2004084631
 WO2005015994
 WO2006007981
 WO2005016001
 WO2005112630
 JPS6087254
 WO9838856
 WO9827049
 WO9900020
 WO2007023719
 WO2007023764
 WO9813361
    - J. CHEM. SOC., (1945), page 438
    - ACTA PHARM. SUECICA, (1972), vol. 9, pages 411 - 418
    - J. ORG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 64, no. 23, pages 8576 - 8581
    - SYNTHESIS, (1998), vol. 9, pages 1335 - 1338
    - J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, no. 18, pages 3386 - 3399
    - J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 67, page 431
    - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2007), vol. 129, no. 43, page 13321
    - J. ORG. CHEM., (1984), vol. 49, no. 22, page 4287
    - S. H. DEWITT, Annual Reports in Combinatorial Chemistry and Molecular Diversity: Automated Synthesis, VERLAG ESCOM, (1997), vol. 1, pages 69 - 77
    - HOUGHTEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, pages 5131 - 5135
    - CHRISTOU, TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 1, pages 423 - 431
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning, A Laboratory Manual, 2. Aufl., COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 2
    - WINNACKER, Gene und Klone 2. Auflage, VCH WEINHEIM, (1996), vol. 2
    - BRAUN ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 3219 - 3227
    - WOLTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 846 - 850
    - SONNEWALD ET AL., PLANT J., (1991), vol. 1, pages 95 - 106
    - WATKINS, Handbook of Insecticide Dust Diluents and Carriers", 2nd Ed., DARLAND BOOKS
    - OLPHEN, Introduction to Clay Colloid Chemistry; 2nd Ed.,, J. WILEY & SONS
    - MCCUTCHEON'S, Detergents and Emulsifiers Annual, MC PUBL. CORP.
    - WINNACKER-KÜCHLER, Chemische Technologie, 4. Aufl., C. HANSER VERLAG, (1986), vol. 7
    - J.E. BROWNING, "Agglomeration", CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING, (1967), page 147 FF
    - Perry's Chemical Engineer's Handbook, 5th Ed.,, MCGRAW-HILL, (1973), pages 8 - 57
    - G.C. KLINGMAN, Weed Control as a Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (1961), pages 81 - 96
    - J.D. FREYER; S.A. EVANS, Weed Control Handbook, 5th Ed.,, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1968), pages 101 - 103
    - WEED RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 26, pages 441 - 445