Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2794568 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2794568



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1033
27.01.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
25.02.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.01.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 12
20.01.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 12
26.11.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.11.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.11.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.11.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 150
26.11.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 150
29.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
29.09.2015 Annex Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 10
29.09.2015 Description Search / examination 140
29.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
01.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
01.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.05.2015 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
10.04.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
14.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.05.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.07.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
24.07.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 155
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 154
03.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
17.12.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
17.12.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 12
17.12.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 140