Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2794568


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
27.01.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
28.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
02.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
19.02.2016 (Expected) grant published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
26.01.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.01.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.11.2015 Change - English title published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
13.11.2015 Change - French title published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
02.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.07.2015 First examination report
24.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
20.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
24.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication