Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2771850

EP2771850 - QUEUE REMOTE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.05.2015
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.06.2015  [2015/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qurami S.R.L.
Via Montebello 8
00185 Roma / IT
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / MACINA, Roberto
Via Seneca, 16
00136 Roma / IT
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Leone, Mario , et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Via XX Settembre, 98g
00187 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Leone, Mario , et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Viale della Tecnica, 205
00144 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date12808889.526.10.2012
WO2012IB55907
Priority number, dateUS201161552770P28.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161552770 P
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013061289
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2771850
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/02
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
TitleGerman:WARTESCHLANGENFERNVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2014/36]
English:QUEUE REMOTE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD[2014/36]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION À DISTANCE DE FILES D'ATTENTE[2014/36]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
16.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/23]
21.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009076875  (LERT JR JOHN G [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0 49] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0088] *;
 [I]US2007286220  (STENNING NORMAN V [GB]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0 32] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraphs [0128] , [ 130] * * paragraphs [0143] , [ 161] * * paragraphs [0173] , [ 240] * * paragraph [0260] - paragraph [0263] * * paragraph [0270] *;
 [A]US2005080651  (MORRISON KELLY L [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0053] *;
 [A]EP1519539  (REALM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 25] * * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0062] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] *;
 [A]US2009106550  (MOHAMED AHMED [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0052] *;
 [A]  - VEIKKOLAINEN M ISOMAKI NOKIA S, "Requirements and Use Cases for Combining SIP Based Real-time Media Sessions With XMPP Based Instant Messaging and Presence Service.; draft-veikkolainen-sip-xmpp-coex-reqs-02.txt", REQUIREMENTS AND USE CASES FOR COMBINING SIP BASED REAL-TIME MEDIA SESSIONS WITH XMPP BASED INSTANT MESSAGING AND PRESENCE SERVICE.; DRAFT-VEIKKOLAINEN-SIP-XMPP-COEX-REQS-02.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET S, (20110126), no. 2, pages 1 - 8, XP015073687 [A] 3 * page 3, line 7 - line 9 *
by applicantUS6529786
 US6748364
 US6845361
 US6889098
 US7047205
 US2011307547