Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794753

EP2794753 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR The Hague / NL
[2018/13]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 The Hague / NL
Inventor(s)01 / STAMPS, Ricky Loy
2035 Edendale Circle
Katy, Texas 77450 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Shell Legal Services IP
p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Matthezing, Robert Maarten
Shell International B.V.
Intellectual Property Services
P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date12809067.717.12.2012
WO2012US70083
Priority number, dateUS201161577694P20.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161577694 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096193
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794753
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/08, C09J123/08, C08L91/00, C08L93/04, C08L57/02, C08L61/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:KLEBEVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG[2014/44]
English:ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME[2014/44]
French:COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
28.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2018
30.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/04]
09.09.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/04]
10.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]CN101818035  (UNIV TONGJI) [X] 1,3-8,10 * example 1 *;
 [X]KR20110035404  (ICURE [KR]) [X] 1,4-6,10 * paragraph [0068]; example 1 *;
 [X]FR2765232  (MOBIL OIL FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * claim -; table 3 *;
 [X]WO2008008420  (CARGILL INC [US]; BRAKSMAYER DIZA PEARL [US]; BOND RISHA [US]; BUNNELL) [X] 1,4-8,10 * example 1; claim -; table 3 *
by applicantEP0776959
 EP0668342
 WO9721788
 WO0015736
 WO0014188
 WO0014187
 WO0014183
 WO0014179
 WO0008115
 WO9941332
 EP1029029
 WO0118156
 WO0157166