Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793919

EP2793919 - NOVEL JNK INHIBITOR MOLECULES FOR TREATMENT OF VARIOUS DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xigen Inflammation Ltd.
Arch. Makariou III
195 Neocleous House
3030 Limassol / CY
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / COMBETTE, Jean-Marc
515, route de Terret
F-74140 Saint Cergues / FR
02 / DELOCHE, Catherine
22, Avenue William-Favre
CH-1207 Genf / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]01 / COMBETTE, Jean-Marc.
515, route de Terret
F-74140 Saint Cergues / FR
02 / DELOCHE, Catherine.
22, Avenue William-Favre
CH-1207 Genf / CH
Representative(s)Graf von Stosch, Andreas , et al
Graf von Stosch
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Graf von Stosch, Andreas , et al
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12809126.121.12.2012
WO2012EP05362
Priority number, dateWO2011EP0648121.12.2011         Original published format: PCT/EP2011/006481
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013091896
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793919
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/02, A61K38/08
[2019/08]
Former International [2014/44]A61K38/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE JNK-HEMMERMOLEKÜLE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VERSCHIEDENER KRANKHEITEN[2014/44]
English:NOVEL JNK INHIBITOR MOLECULES FOR TREATMENT OF VARIOUS DISEASES[2014/44]
French:NOUVELLES MOLÉCULES INHIBITRICES DE LA JNK POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DIVERSES MALADIES[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
06.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201807   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2009143865  (XIGEN SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,16-19,21-26,28,29,31,33,34,49,51,52,58,60-62,66 * the whole document * * pages 9-12; claim 19; sequence 56 * [Y] 1-66;
 [XP]WO2011160653  (XIGEN SA [CH], et al) [XP] 1-66 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2011160827  (XIGEN SA [CH], et al) [XP] 1-66 * the whole document *;
 [T]WO2012048721  (XIGEN SA [CH], et al) [T] 1-66;
 [T]WO2012048893  (XIGEN SA [CH], et al) [T] 1-66
 [Y]  - BONNY C ET AL, "Cell-permeable peptide inhibitors of JNK: novel blockers of beta-cell death", DIABETES, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, US, (20010101), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.2337/DIABETES.50.1.77, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 77 - 82, XP002172261 [Y] 1-66 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.50.1.77
 [A]  - E. TOUCHARD ET AL, "A Peptide Inhibitor of c-Jun N-Terminal Kinase for the Treatment of Endotoxin-Induced Uveitis", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (20100901), vol. 51, no. 9, doi:10.1167/iovs.09-4733, ISSN 0146-0404, pages 4683 - 4693, XP055043006 [A] 1-66

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/iovs.09-4733
 [A]  - BONNY C ET AL, "TARGETING THE JNK PATHWAY AS A THERAPEUTIC PROTECTIVE STRATEGY FOR NERVOUS SYSTEM DISEASES", REVIEWS IN THE NEUROSCIENCES, TEL AVIV, IS, (20050101), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0334-1763, pages 57 - 67, XP009061133 [A] 1-66
 [A]  - FORNONI ET AL, "The l-isoform but not d-isoforms of a JNK inhibitory peptide protects pancreatic beta-cells", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20070123), vol. 354, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2006.12.186, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 227 - 233, XP005736169 [A] 1-66 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2006.12.186
by applicantWO2007031280
 WO9849188
 WO03103698
 WO2010113753
 WO2010151638
 US5804604
 US5674980
 WO9705265
    - HUI, NATURE GENETICS, (200706), vol. 39, no. 6
    - ZHUANG ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20060329), vol. 26, no. 13, pages 3551 - 3560
    - BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2007), pages 1341 - 1348
    - KUAN ET AL., CURRENT DRUG TARGETS - CNS & NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS, (200502), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 63 - 67
    - SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, no. 5326, pages 693 - 696
    - DIABETES, (2001), vol. 50, pages 77 - 82
    - BONNY ET AL., REVIEWS IN NEUROSCIENCES, (2005), pages 57 - 67
    - BORSELLO ET AL., NAT MED, (2003), no. 9, pages 1180 - 1186
    - IMMUNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 118, no. L, pages 112 - 121
    - KENNEDY ET AL., CELL CYCLE, (2003), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 199 - 201
    - LEE YONG HEE ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, no. 5, pages 2896 - 2902
    - MILANO ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL HEART CIRC PHYSIOL, (2007), vol. 192, no. 4, pages H1828 - H1835
    - PAN ET AL., LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (2010), vol. 90, pages 156 - 167
    - PIRVOLA ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (2000), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 43 - 50
    - RODUIT ET AL., APOPTOSIS, (2008), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 343 - 353
    - ZOUKHRI ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 96, pages 126 - 135
    - TOUCHARD ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2010), vol. 51, no. 9, pages 4683 - 4693
    - ROY ET AL., J GASTROENTEROL, (2008), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 200 - 202
    - BECKHAM ET AL., J VIROL. 2007 JUL, vol. 81, no. 13, pages 6984 - 6992
    - PALIN ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (200805), vol. 197, no. 4, pages 629 - 635
    - GUENAT ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2006), vol. 11, pages 1015 - 1026
    - GRANTHAM, R., SCIENCE, (1974), vol. 185, pages 862 - 864
    - KARLIN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877
    - ALTSCHUL, J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - ALTSCHUL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - PEARSON, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 183, pages 63 - 98
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448
    - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), pages 387 - 395
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, J. MOL. BIOL., (1981), vol. 147, pages 195 - 197
    - ELLIOTT; O'HARE, CELL, (1997), vol. 88, pages 223 - 233
    - JACKSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10691 - 10695
    - RUBEN, S., J. VIROL, (1989), vol. 63, pages 1 - 8
    - HAUBER, J., J. VIROL, (1989), vol. 63, pages 1181 - 1187
    - FRANKEL, A. D. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 70 - 73
    - FRANKEL, A. D. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 6297 - 6300
    - GARCIA, J. A. ET AL., EMBO J., (1988), vol. 7, page 3143
    - SADAIE, M. R. ET AL., J. VIROL, (1989), vol. 63, no. 1
    - BACHMAIR, A., CELL, (1989), vol. 56, pages 1019 - 1032
    - FLORENCE MEYER-LOSIC ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2008), pages 2145 - 53
    - KAMEYAMA ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (2007), vol. 88, pages 98 - 107
    - TUGYI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), pages 413 - 418