Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791252

EP2791252 - TRIAROMATIC AZOMETHINE DIRECT DYES, DYE COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH DYE, METHOD OF IMPLEMENTATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'OREAL
14 rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SABELLE, Stéphane
17 rue Saint Severin
F-75005 Paris / FR
02 / LEDUC, Madeleine
29 rue des Boulets
F-75011 Paris / FR
03 / GUERARD, Olivier
12 rue Massenet
F-93250 Villemomble / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]01 / SABELLE, Stéphane
17 rue Saint Severin
F-75005 Paris / FR
02 / LEDUC, Madeleine
29 rue des Boulets
F-75011 Paris / FR
03 / GUERARD, Olivier
17 Avenue du Raincy
F-93250 Villemonble / FR
Representative(s)Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12809187.313.12.2012
WO2012EP75383
Priority number, dateFR2011006157613.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161576
US201261584999P10.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584999 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087768
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791252
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09B55/00, A61K8/34, A61K8/35, A61K8/41, A61K8/42, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/10
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:TRIAROMATISCHE AZOMETHINDIREKTFÄRBEMITTEL, FARBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ZUMINDEST EINEM DERARTIGEN FÄRBEMITTEL SOWIE IMPLEMENTATIONS- UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/43]
English:TRIAROMATIC AZOMETHINE DIRECT DYES, DYE COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH DYE, METHOD OF IMPLEMENTATION AND USE[2014/43]
French:COLORANTS DIRECTS D'AZOMÉTHINE TRIAROMATIQUES, COMPOSITION DE COLORANT COMPRENANT AU MOINS L'UN DE CES COLORANTS, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN UVRE ET LEUR UTILISATION[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
26.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/04]
13.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08259509  (NIPPON KANKO SHIKISO KENKYUSHO) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * page 4; compound 6 *;
 [X]JPH02265790  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * page 583; compound 4 *;
 [I]FR2946647  (OREAL [FR]) [I] 1-18 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 8; compound 5 * * page 2, lines 7-12 * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011041263  (LEDUC MADELEINE [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BONNET A ET AL, "Trinoyaux. Détermination des structures par RMN1H,13C et 15N", JOURNAL DE CHIMIE PHYSIQUE, SOCIETE DE CHIMIE PHYSIQUE, PARIS, FR, (19950101), vol. 92, no. 10, ISSN 0021-7689, pages 1823 - 1828, XP009161747 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2234277
 FR2047932
 FR2106661
 FR2121101
 GB1026978
 GB1153196
 FR2801308
 DE2359399
 JPS63169571
 JPH0563124
 EP0770375
 WO9615765
 DE3843892
 DE4133957
 WO9408969
 WO9408970
 FR2733749
 DE19543988
 FR2886136
 WO9515144
 WO9501772
 EP0714954
 FR2056799
 FR2165965
 FR2262023