Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788882

EP2788882 - AUTO-ORDERING OF STRONGLY ORDERED, DEVICE, AND EXCLUSIVE TRANSACTIONS ACROSS MULTIPLE MEMORY REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / PANAVICH, Jason Lawrence
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / DIEFFENDERFER, James Norris
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / SARTORIUS, Thomas Andrew
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / SPEIER, Thomas Philip
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2016/15]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2014/42]Roche, Dermot , et al
Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date12809452.110.12.2012
[2016/15]
WO2012US68820
Priority number, dateUS20111331537009.12.2011         Original published format: US201113315370
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086529
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788882
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2788882
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/16
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR STRENGE AUTOMATISCHE SORTIERUNG UND EXKLUSIVE TRANSAKTIONEN ÜBER MEHRERE SPEICHERBEREICHE[2014/42]
English:AUTO-ORDERING OF STRONGLY ORDERED, DEVICE, AND EXCLUSIVE TRANSACTIONS ACROSS MULTIPLE MEMORY REGIONS[2014/42]
French:AUTO-ORDONNANCEMENT DE DISPOSITIFS ET DE TRANSACTIONS EXCLUSIVES FORTEMENT ORDONNÉES SUR L'ENSEMBLE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE ZONES DE MÉMOIRE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2014National basic fee paid 
22.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
14.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2016Fee for grant paid
17.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2015
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.12.2012
AL13.04.2016
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU10.12.2012
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU10.12.2012
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
MT10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU10.12.2012
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU10.12.2012
AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MK13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
IE10.12.2016
LU10.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
SM13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.04.2016
BE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
IT13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
HR13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RS13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
NO13.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]US6754751  (WILLKE THEODORE L [US]) [I] 1-34 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 63; figures 1,2,4,5,12 * * column 7, lines 1-25 * * column 7, lines 41-60 * * column 9, lines 20-62 *;
 [I]US6275913  (JEDDELOH JOSEPH M [US]) [I] 1-34 * column 2, lines 1-19; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2003009622  (GASKINS DARIUS D [US] ET AL GASKINS DARUIS D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0017]; figure 1 *