Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791300

EP2791300 - PATTERNED CANDLE WICK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smith Mountain Industries, Inc
1000 Dillard Drive
Forest, VA 24551-2760 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SPANGLER, Mark, A.
311 Spring Hill Circle
Bedford, VA 24523 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12809517.114.12.2012
[2018/31]
WO2012US69858
Priority number, dateUS201161570447P14.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161570447 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013090789
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791300
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2791300
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C11C5/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEMUSTERTER KERZENDOCHT[2014/43]
English:PATTERNED CANDLE WICK[2014/43]
French:MÈCHE DE BOUGIE À MOTIF[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2018Fee for grant paid
22.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2017
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
LU14.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
LU14.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XDP]WO2012145380  (RAMIREZ JOHN [US]) [XDP] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1; claims 1,7-11,14 *;
 [XI]US2011024945  (DECKER DAYNA M [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0031] , [0074]; figures 1-5; claims 1,8,11,12 * [I] 3-5,8-10;
 [XAI]WO02099022  (NOVAFLAME PTY LTD [AU]; GARNYS VYT [AU]) [X] 1,3,7 * page 6, line 15 - line 18; figures 3,4 * * page 8, line 3 - line 15 * [A] 2,10 [I] 4-6,8,9;
 [XAI]DE202007012159U  (BOEHM HANS GEORG [DE]) [X] 1,3,7 * figure 3; claim 2 * [A] 10 [I] 2,4-6,8,9