Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801021

EP2801021 - ALTERNATE VIEW VIDEO PLAYBACK ON A SECOND SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2018/40]
Former [2017/21]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing DTV
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / WALKER, Mark Leroy
30027 Cambridge Ave
Castaic, California 91384 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Hammes, Pierre , et al
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble Visium
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12809561.927.12.2012
WO2012US71822
Priority number, dateUS201261584134P06.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261584134 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103583
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801021
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/14, H04N21/41, H04N21/4722
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:VIDEOABSPIELUNG MIT ALTERNATIVER SICHT AUF EINEM ZWEITEN BILDSCHIRM[2014/46]
English:ALTERNATE VIEW VIDEO PLAYBACK ON A SECOND SCREEN[2014/46]
French:LECTURE VIDÉO À VUE ALTERNATIVE SUR UN SECOND ÉCRAN[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
20.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2017
05.12.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination07.03.2018Appeal received No.  T1413/18
17.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011289532  (YU LEI [CN], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0044] , [0054] , [0057] , [0062] - [0067] - [0074] - [0077] - [0102]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2011053271  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1,6,10,11,15 * page 1, lines 16-30 * * page 5, lines 3-12 * * page 7, lines 6-31 * * page 10, lines 4-6 * * page 11, lines 18-20; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2011320627  (LANDOW KATE [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0025] - [0040] , [0054] , [0062] - [0063] - [0066] , [0068] , [0071]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2011103763  (TSE HON KWAN [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] - [0010] - [0012] , [0024] , [0053] - [0054] - [0061] - [0064] - [0066] - [0067] - [0090] - [0092]; figures 1,3,7 *;
 [X]US2008092164  (AGARWAL ANJANA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] - [0027] - [0032] , [0034] - [0037]; figures 1,2,3,6 *;
 [X]US2010280641  (HARKNESS DAVID HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0049] , [0058] , [0059] , [0063] - [0064] - [0087] , [0104] , [0191] , [0192]; figures 1,3,25-31 *;
 [X]WO2009129345  (NOVAFORA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9-11,15 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0048] , [0050] , [0053] , [0075] , [0078] , [0081] , [0084] , [0145] - [0147] - [0149]; figures 5,6-9 *
 [X]  - CHRISTOPHER HOWSON ET AL, "Second screen TV synchronization", CONSUMER ELECTRONICS - BERLIN (ICCE-BERLIN), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110906), doi:10.1109/ICCE-BERLIN.2011.6031815, ISBN 978-1-4577-0233-4, pages 361 - 365, XP031968555 [X] 1,4,10,14,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCE-Berlin.2011.6031815