Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797497

EP2797497 - A HANDHELD DIABETES MANAGER WITH A PERSONAL DATA MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2014
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.11.2014  [2014/48]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / MEARS, Mark, G.
15036 Halifax Ct.
Westfield, IN 46074 / US
02 / PASH, Phillip, E.
1321 Goldenrod Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46219-3952 / US
03 / RIZZO, Vincent, R.
10427 Plumas Ln
Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US
04 / STEINER, Bettina
Rheingasse 26
CH-5466 Kaiserstuhl / CH
05 / WESTERFIELD, Kristin, M.
5717 Durham Castle Ct.
Apt 325
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Poredda, Andreas
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Poredda, Andreas
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date12809611.217.12.2012
WO2012EP05183
Priority number, dateUS201161581149P29.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161581149 P
US20121366153926.10.2012         Original published format: US201213661539
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097929
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797497
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B5/145, A61M5/142
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGBARE DIABETESVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM PERSONALISIERTEN DATENMODUL[2014/45]
English:A HANDHELD DIABETES MANAGER WITH A PERSONAL DATA MODULE[2014/45]
French:GESTIONNAIRE DE DIABÈTE PORTATIF ÉQUIPÉ D'UN MODULE DE DONNÉES PERSONNELLES[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2014National basic fee paid 
29.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
22.10.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/48]
Cited inInternational search[I]US2011124996  (REINKE ROBERT E [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0046] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0062] - [0074] * * figures 1,4,11a-11b *;
 [I]US2003114836  (ESTES MARK C [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] , [0037] - [0041] - [0049] , [0052] , [0055] , [0057] - [0064]; figures 4-5 *;
 [A]US2011287528  (FERN JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0114] - [0132] - [ 149] - [0170]; figures 5-7f *;
 [A]US2010274592  (NITZAN TAMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0252]; figures 43a-43b *;
 [A]US2002193679  (MALAVE LUIS J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 16-29 *;
 [A]US2008312585  (BRUKALO KRZYSZTOF Z [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0088] - [0094]; figures 24-27 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] - [0043] - [0045] - [0050] - [0052]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0053]; figure 6 * * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] * * paragraph [0059]; figures 9a,9b * * paragraphs [0063] - [0064] - [0083] - [0084]; figures 13-15,17-20 *