Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793903

EP2793903 - DIALYSIS PRECURSOR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O. Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / JANSSON, Olof
Näktergalsgatan 33
S-235 38 Vellinge / SE
02 / GUSTAFSSON, Jens
Gråbrödersgatan 4
S-211 21 Malmö / SE
03 / LINDEN, Torbjörn
Fabian Månssons väg 1
S-370 23 Hasslö / SE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Sweden SHS IP Office
Gambro Lundia AB
P.O. Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
[2018/22]
Former [2014/44]Jönsson, Anneli
Gambro Lundia AB
Legal and IP Department
Box 10101
220 10 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date12809670.811.12.2012
[2018/22]
WO2012EP75007
Priority number, dateSE2011005123421.12.2011         Original published format: SE 1151234
US201161578249P21.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578249 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092283
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793903
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793903
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7004, A61K33/00, A61K33/06, A61K33/14, A61K9/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIALYSEVORLÄUFERZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2014/44]
English:DIALYSIS PRECURSOR COMPOSITION[2014/44]
French:COMPOSITION DE PRÉCURSEUR POUR DIALYSE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2018Fee for grant paid
19.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2017
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU11.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
LU11.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/08]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/03]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010112547  (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]; CARLSSON OLA [SE]; DRIESCHMANNS HANS-RAINER [DE) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0567452
 EP1714657