Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795648

EP2795648 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST PARTICLES GENERATED BY AN ELECTRIC SWITCHING ARC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / RODRIGUES, Didier
23 rue du Pilat
F-38200 Serpaize / FR
02 / FRIGIERE, Denis
117 rue de la République
F-69150 Decines / FR
03 / WILLIEME, Jean Marc
20 Chemin des Chassagnes
F-69350 La Mulatiere / FR
04 / JACQUIER, Frank
4 rue Maillol
F-69780 Mions / FR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12809822.521.12.2012
[2015/41]
WO2012EP76712
Priority number, dateFR2011006219021.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1162190
[2014/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093033
Date:27.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795648
Date:29.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795648
Date:07.10.2015
Language:FR
[2015/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01H33/04, H01H33/08, H01H9/30, H01H33/662
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VOR PARTIKELN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LICHTBOGENS[2014/44]
English:DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST PARTICLES GENERATED BY AN ELECTRIC SWITCHING ARC[2014/44]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES PARTICULES ENGENDREES PAR UN ARC ELECTRIQUE DE COMMUTATION[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
04.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2015Fee for grant paid
27.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.05.2015
Opposition(s)08.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.12.2012
AL07.10.2015
AT07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU21.12.2012
AT07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU21.12.2012
AT07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2017/39]HU21.12.2012
AT07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/45]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE21.12.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/38]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
LU21.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/33]AT07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US3984651  (LEWIS CHARLES E ET AL) [A] 1-6 * column 5, lines 37-40; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]EP1005058  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0038]; figure 2 *
by applicantEP0982748
 US6211478