Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786448

EP2786448 - HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNT METHOD AND HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNTING JIG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.12.2015  [2015/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / SAITO, Takahiro
c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12809867.029.11.2012
WO2012JP81578
Priority number, dateJP2011026081029.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011260810
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081175
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786448
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/72, H01R43/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES SCHRUMPFSCHLAUCHES UND MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHRUMPFSCHLAUCH[2014/41]
English:HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNT METHOD AND HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNTING JIG[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE DE TUBE THERMORÉTRACTABLE ET GABARIT DE MONTAGE DE TUBE THERMORÉTRACTABLE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2014National basic fee paid 
28.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
30.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1528628  (TYCO ELECTRONICS RAYCHEM KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2006261065  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *
by applicantJP2005135858