EP2795532 - IMAGING DEVICE HAVING LIGHT FIELD IMAGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, LLC One Zebra Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Motorola Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Duanfeng 29 Brayton Court N. South Setauket, New York 11720 / US | 02 /
GUREVICH, Vladimir 37 Brompton Rd, Apt. 6B Great Neck, New York 11021 / US | 03 /
GOREN, David P. 54 Steven Place Smithtown, New York 11787 / US | 04 /
FAN, Nong-Qiang 806 Spruce Drive Holbrook, New York 11741 / US | [2014/48] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
HE, Duanfeng 29 Brayton Court N. South Setauket, New York 11720 / US | ||
02 /
GUREVICH, Vladimir 34 Malvern Lane Stony Brook, New York 11790 / US | |||
03 /
GOREN, David P. 54 Steven Place Smithtown, New York 11787 / US | |||
04 /
FAN, Nong-Qiang 806 Spruce Drive Holbrook, New York 11741 / US | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12809947.0 | 14.12.2012 | WO2012US69658 | Priority number, date | US201113334428 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: US201113334428 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013096104 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2795532 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14, G06K7/10 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
G06K7/10722 (EP,US);
G06K7/10 (KR);
G06K7/14 (US);
G06K7/10811 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | G06K7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM LICHTFELDBILDSENSOR | [2014/44] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE HAVING LIGHT FIELD IMAGE SENSOR | [2014/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À CAPTEUR D'IMAGE DE CHAMP LUMINEUX | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 19.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009160975 (KWAN SIK PIU [US]) [X] 14-26 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0026] *[I] 1-13 |