Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2777364

EP2777364 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AT LEAST ONE LED BY MEANS OF DITHERING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / KELLER, Ueli
Lindenstrasse 10
CH-8738 Uetliburg / CH
02 / KUENG, Thomas
Pfaendlergut 17
CH-8772 Nidfurn / CH
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/38]
Application number, filing date12810034.412.11.2012
[2016/11]
WO2012AT00289
Priority number, dateAT20110000619U11.11.2011         Original published format: AT 6192011 U
[2017/03]
Former [2014/38]AT2011000061911.11.2011
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013067564
Date:16.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2777364
Date:17.09.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2777364
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN VON WENIGSTENS EINER LED MITTELS DITHERING[2014/38]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING AT LEAST ONE LED BY MEANS OF DITHERING[2014/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'AU MOINS UNE DEL PAR VIBRATIONS[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2014National basic fee paid 
09.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
16.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2016Fee for grant paid
11.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2015
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.11.2012
AL16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE12.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU12.11.2012
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE12.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU12.11.2012
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE12.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU12.11.2012
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE12.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE12.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/12]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
BE30.11.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2011126374  (ELDOLAB HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 14 * * page 12, line 13 - page 12, line 28 * * figures 2, 25A *;
 [I]WO2010128845  (ELDOLAB HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 19, line 25 - page 20, line 12 * * page 24, line 11 - page 25, line 35 * * figures 23, 25A-C *;
 [IP]WO2011140660  (LUMASTREAM CANADA ULC [CA], et al) [IP] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 11, line 12 - page 15, paragraph 3 * * figures 4-9 *;
 [A]US7928712  (LEVESQUE CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 46 - column 1, line 62 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 35 * * figure 6B *
by applicantDE102006034371