Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807107

EP2807107 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INSTALLING A ROTOR HUB OF A WIND POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A ROTOR HUB ON A WIND TURBINE
[2015/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wobben Properties GmbH
Borsigstrasse 26
26607 Aurich / DE
[2016/01]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Wobben Properties GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KNOOP, Frank
Nee Streek 13
26607 Aurich / DE
02 / KUIPER, Gerrit
Esenser Postweg 43
26607 Aurich / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date12810221.718.12.2012
[2016/11]
WO2012EP76021
Priority number, dateDE20121020108825.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012201088
[2014/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110417
Date:01.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807107
Date:03.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807107
Date:16.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B66C1/10, F03D1/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBA25.08.2014
ME25.08.2014
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MONTIEREN EINER ROTORNABE EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE[2014/49]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INSTALLING A ROTOR HUB OF A WIND POWER PLANT[2015/41]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'INSTALLATION D'UN MOYEU DE ROTOR D'UNE EOLIENNE[2015/41]
Former [2014/49]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A ROTOR HUB ON A WIND TURBINE
Former [2014/49]PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE D'UN MOYEU DE ROTOR D'UNE ÉOLIENNE
Entry into regional phase25.08.2014National basic fee paid 
25.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2016Fee for grant paid
11.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2015
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
[2017/47]
Former [2016/50]SM16.03.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2008089763  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12 * page 3, lines 23-26 * * page 4, lines 28-31 * * figures 6a-6d * * page 9, paragraph 3 *;
 [X]WO2011026970  (SUZLON ENERGY GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11,12 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2011220538  (NIES JACOB JOHANNES [NL]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [AD]EP2072812  (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008000267  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
ExaminationEP2525092
by applicantDE102007062428