Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794199

EP2794199 - INSTALLATION COMPRISING A GLOVE BOX AND A GLOVE CHANGE DEVICE INCORPORATING MONITORING OF THE GLOVE CHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Getinge La Calhene
1, rue du Comté de Donegal
41100 Vendôme / FR
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / FOURNIER, Bruno
185 rue des Madeleines
F-41100 Saint Ouen / FR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12810273.820.12.2012
[2015/51]
WO2012EP76427
Priority number, dateFR2011006237423.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1162374
[2014/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092882
Date:27.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794199
Date:29.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794199
Date:16.12.2015
Language:FR
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B25J21/02
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG MIT EINEM HANDSCHUHFACH UND HANDSCHUHWECHSELVORRICHTUNG MIT ÜBERWACHUNG DES HANDSCHUHWECHSELS[2014/44]
English:INSTALLATION COMPRISING A GLOVE BOX AND A GLOVE CHANGE DEVICE INCORPORATING MONITORING OF THE GLOVE CHANGE[2014/44]
French:INSTALLATION COMPORTANT UNE BOITE A GANTS ET UN DISPOSITIF DE CHANGEMENT DE GANT INTEGRANT UN SUIVI DU CHANGEMENT DES GANTS[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
09.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2015Fee for grant paid
21.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2015
Opposition(s)19.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.12.2012
AL16.12.2015
AT16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
TR16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
LU20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU20.12.2012
AT16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
TR16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
LU20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
Former [2018/31]HU20.12.2012
AT16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
LU20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
Former [2018/02]HU20.12.2012
AT16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
LU20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
Former [2017/39]HU20.12.2012
AT16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
Former [2017/16]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
Former [2016/49]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
Former [2016/46]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
DE01.07.2016
Former [2016/45]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE20.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/42]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
RS16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT16.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]FR2652143  (EURITECH [FR]) [AD] 1-25 * abstract * * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 5 * * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 3 * * page 12, line 33 - line 35 *;
 [A]FR2951516  (SARTORIUS STEDIM ASEPTICS [FR]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102006043686  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0009] *;
 [A]FR2864235  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-25 * figure 1 * * page 8, line 3 - line 14 *
by applicantFR2652143