Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793947

EP2793947 - ENZYMATIC CONJUGATION OF POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innate Pharma
117, Avenue de Luminy
13009 Marseille / FR
For all designated states
Paul Scherrer Institut
5232 Villigen PSI / CH
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BREGEON, Delphine
20 Rue de Suez
13007 Marseille / FR
02 / DENNLER, Patrick
Rankstrasse 13
5430 Wettingen / CH
03 / BELMANT, Christian
36 Impasse du Hameau de la Tour
83140 Six-Fours-Les-Plages / FR
04 / GAUTHIER, Laurent
30 Chemin du Lancier
Résidence la Sarette Bât 8
13008 Marseille / FR
05 / ROMAGNÈ, François
12 Boulevard Félibrige
13009 Marseille / FR
06 / FISCHER, Eliane
Schübelbachstrasse 10
8193 Eglisau / CH
07 / SCHIBLI, Roger
Schartenrainstrasse 42
5400 Baden / CH
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Gallois, Valérie
Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Völlmy, Lukas
Innate Pharma
IP Department
117, avenue de Luminy
13009 Marseille / FR
Application number, filing date12810292.821.12.2012
WO2012EP76606
Priority number, dateUS201161579908P23.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161579908 P
US201261661569P19.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261661569 P
US201261671122P13.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261671122 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013092983
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2793947
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.04.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/68, A61P35/00, C07D225/08
[2018/21]
Former International [2014/44]A61K47/48, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:ENZYMATISCHE KONJUGATION VON POLYPEPTIDEN[2014/44]
English:ENZYMATIC CONJUGATION OF POLYPEPTIDES[2014/44]
French:CONJUGAISON ENZYMATIQUE DE POLYPEPTIDES[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2014National basic fee paid 
18.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2018/21]
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.11.2018Request for further processing filed
23.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.12.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2011184147  (KAMIYA NORIHO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-3,12-23,28-54,57,64,66-88 * the whole document *
    [XDYI] - JEGER S. ET AL., "Site-Specific and stoichiometric Modification of Antibodies by Bacterial Transglutaminase", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (20101217), vol. 49, pages 9995 - 9997, XP002695029 [XD] 1-3,12-17,20-22,30-32,34-40,42-47,64,66-81 * Abstract, page 9995, Figure 1; page 9996. Supportive information pages 8, 30 and 31. * [Y] 33,41,42,48,83-88 [I] 18,19,49-54,57,82

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ANIE.201004243
 [XYI]  - Jeger S., PhD Thesis, Site-specific conjugation of Tumour-Targeting Antibodies Using Transglutaminase, Zürich, ETH Zürich, (20090101), XP002695030 [X] 1-3,12-17,20-22,30-32,34-40,42-47,64,66-81 * Pages 51-85 * [Y] 33,41,42,48,83-88 [I] 18,19,49-54,57,82
 [X]  - THOMAS L MINDT ET AL, "Modification of different IgG1 antibodies via glutamine and lysine using bacterial and human tissue transglutaminase", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1021/BC700306N, ISSN 1043-1802, (20080101), pages 271 - 278, (20071108), XP002676805 [X] 64,65 * Abstract; page 272 figure 1; page 274 Scheme 1; page 275 second column paragraphs 1-3. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700306n
 [Y]  - KEYANG XU ET AL, "Characterization of intact antibodydrug conjugates from plasma/serum in vivo by affinity capture capillary liquid chromatographymass spectrometry", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 412, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2011.01.004, ISSN 0003-2697, (20110104), pages 56 - 66, (20110107), XP028173871 [Y] 83-88 * Abstract, page 58 Figure 1. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2011.01.004
 [Y]  - C. WÄNGLER ET AL, "Antibody-Dendrimer Conjugates: The Number, Not the Size of the Dendrimers, Determines the Immunoreactivity", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20080401), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.1021/bc700308q, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 813 - 820, XP055020206 [Y] 33,41,42,48 * Abstract; page 815, figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700308q
 [AD]  - CHI-WANG LIN ET AL, "Transglutaminase-Catalyzed Site-Specific Conjugation of Small-Molecule Probes to Proteins in Vitro and on the Surface of Living Cells", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20060401), vol. 128, no. 14, doi:10.1021/ja0604111, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 4542 - 4543, XP055028216 [AD] 1-3,12-23,28-54,57,64,66-88 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0604111
by applicantUS2011184147
 WO2005040219
 US2005238646
 US2002161201
 US6162963
 US5565332
 US5573905
 US5567610
 US5229275
 WO9211018
 US4816567
 US7763736
 US7807619
 US8133515
 WO02083180
 WO2004043493
 US2005256030
 US5156956
 US5252469
 JP2003199569
 US5731183
 WO9606931
 WO9622366
 EP0555649
 US5736356
 EP1859811
 WO2010115630
 WO2012041504
 WO2011120053
 US2005238649
 WO2007008848
 WO2007008603
 WO2011085523
 WO2009105969
 DE19907588
 WO9825929
 WO9958534
 WO9902514
 WO9967252
 WO9967253
 WO9907692
 EP0994915
 WO0000485
 WO0001333
 WO0066589
 WO0049019
 WO0049020
 WO0049021
 WO0071521
 WO0037473
 WO0057874
 WO0192255
 WO0181342
 WO0173103
 WO0164650
 WO0170716
 US6204388
 US6387927
 US6380394
 US252028
 US258286
 US262030
 WO0232844
 WO0230356
 WO0214323
 WO0208440
 WO9310102
 WO0127308
 WO02080846
 WO03074053
 WO2004014919
 WO9222583
 US4741900
 US7090843
    - JOSTEN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2000), vol. 240, pages 47 - 54
    - MINDT ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (2008), vol. 19, pages 271 - 278
    - JEGER ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2010), vol. 49, pages 9995 - 9997
    - KAMIYA ET AL., ENZYME. MICROB. TECHNOL., (2003), vol. 33, pages 492 - 496
    - ILL ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (1997), vol. 10, pages 949 - 57
    - HOLLIGER; HUDSON, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1126 - 1136
    - EDELMAN, G.M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. USA, (1969), vol. 63, pages 78 - 85
    - CARILLO ET AL., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073
    - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCL. ACID. RES., (1984), vol. 12, page 387
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - Antibody Purification Handbook
    - JAKOBOVITZ, NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, page 255
    - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, page 544
    - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553
    - GRIFFITH ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734
    - MORRISON ET AL., PNAS, (1984), page 6851
    - JONES, NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525
    - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 522
    - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323
    - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, page 593
    - VERHOEYEN, SCIENCE, vol. 239, page 1534
    - SAZINSKY ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2008), vol. 105, no. 51, pages 20167 - 20172
    - CARTER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 4431 - 4443
    - HO ET AL., GENE (AMST., (1989), vol. 77, pages 51 - 59
    - KUNKEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 82, page 488
    - LIU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 20252 - 20260
    - ITO ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 102, pages 67 - 70
    - VALLETTE ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 723 - 733
    - WELLS ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 34, pages 315 - 323
    - KAJIWARA ET AL., AM. J. CLIN. PATHOL., (2011), vol. 136, no. 1, pages 138 - 144
    - JEGER ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT., (2010), vol. 49, pages 9995 - 9997
    - HAY ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, page 2237
    - RODRIGUES ET AL., CHEMISTRY BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 2, page 223
    - AMSBERRY ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, page 5867
    - KINGSBURY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1984), vol. 27, page 1447
    - FOLK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, pages 3695 - 3700
    - LORAND, L. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, pages 1756 - 1765
    - MURTHY, S.N. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 22907 - 22911
    - LORAND, L.; GRAHAM, R.M., NAT. REV. MOL. CELL BIOL., (2003), vol. 4, pages 140 - 156
    - ANDO ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 53, pages 2613 - 2617
    - HAMBLETT ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 7063 - 7070
    - WAKANKAR ET AL., MABS, (2011), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 161 - 172
    - LYON ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (2012), vol. 502, pages 123 - 138
    - KAEMPFER, J GEN MICROBIOL, (1991), vol. 137, pages 1831 - 1892
    - MOL. PHARM., (2004), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 375 - 382
    - DORONINA ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CFIEM., (2006), vol. 17, pages 1 14 - 124
    - CHAPMAN, ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 54, pages 531 - 545
    - KNOGLER ET AL., CLIN CANER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 603 - 611
    - MAEDA ET AL., CANCER SCI., (2010), vol. 101, no. 1, pages 224 - 230
    - J. R. JUNUTULA ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2008), vol. 26, page 925
    - BRABEZ N. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 54, no. 20, pages 7375 - 7384
    - KUIL J. ET AL., ORGANIC AND BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 7, pages 4088 - 4094
    - SUZUKI ET AL., GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 12, pages 183 - 193