EP2793947 - ENZYMATIC CONJUGATION OF POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innate Pharma 117, Avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | For all designated states Paul Scherrer Institut 5232 Villigen PSI / CH | [2021/05] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Innate Pharma 117, Avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | ||
For all designated states Paul Scherrer Institut 5232 Villigen PSI / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREGEON, Delphine 20 Rue de Suez 13007 Marseille / FR | 02 /
DENNLER, Patrick Rankstrasse 13 5430 Wettingen / CH | 03 /
BELMANT, Christian 36 Impasse du Hameau de la Tour 83140 Six-Fours-Les-Plages / FR | 04 /
GAUTHIER, Laurent 30 Chemin du Lancier Résidence la Sarette Bât 8 13008 Marseille / FR | 05 /
ROMAGNÉ, François 12 Boulevard Félibrige 13009 Marseille / FR | 06 /
FISCHER, Eliane Schübelbachstrasse 10 8193 Eglisau / CH | 07 /
SCHIBLI, Roger Schartenrainstrasse 42 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/25] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
BREGEON, Delphine 20 Rue de Suez 13007 Marseille / FR | ||
02 /
DENNLER, Patrick Rankstrasse 13 5430 Wettingen / CH | |||
03 /
BELMANT, Christian 36 Impasse du Hameau de la Tour 83140 Six-Fours-Les-Plages / FR | |||
04 /
GAUTHIER, Laurent 30 Chemin du Lancier Résidence la Sarette Bât 8 13008 Marseille / FR | |||
05 /
ROMAGNÈ, François 12 Boulevard Félibrige 13009 Marseille / FR | |||
06 /
FISCHER, Eliane Schübelbachstrasse 10 8193 Eglisau / CH | |||
07 /
SCHIBLI, Roger Schartenrainstrasse 42 5400 Baden / CH | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/05] | Gallois, Valérie Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/44] | Völlmy, Lukas Innate Pharma IP Department 117, avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 12810292.8 | 21.12.2012 | [2021/05] | WO2012EP76606 | Priority number, date | US201161579908P | 23.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161579908 P | US201261661569P | 19.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261661569 P | US201261671122P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671122 P | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013092983 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2793947 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2793947 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61P35/00, C07D225/08, A61K47/60, C07D257/08, C07D277/06, C12N9/10 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
C07D225/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/6803 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (US);
A61K47/68 (US);
A61K47/68031 (EP);
A61K47/6807 (US);
A61K47/6813 (US);
A61K47/6817 (US);
A61K47/6865 (EP,US);
A61K47/6871 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C217/08 (US);
C07C223/02 (US);
C07C229/26 (US);
C07C233/62 (US);
C07C247/04 (US);
C07C323/12 (US);
C07C323/60 (US);
C07D257/08 (EP,US);
C07D277/06 (EP,US);
C07F9/5022 (US);
C07K16/00 (US);
C07K19/00 (US);
C12N9/1044 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | A61K47/68, A61P35/00, C07D225/08 | ||
Former IPC [2014/44] | A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHE KONJUGATION VON POLYPEPTIDEN | [2014/44] | English: | ENZYMATIC CONJUGATION OF POLYPEPTIDES | [2014/44] | French: | CONJUGAISON ENZYMATIQUE DE POLYPEPTIDES | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2018/21] | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2012 | AL | 03.02.2021 | AT | 03.02.2021 | CY | 03.02.2021 | CZ | 03.02.2021 | DK | 03.02.2021 | EE | 03.02.2021 | ES | 03.02.2021 | FI | 03.02.2021 | HR | 03.02.2021 | IT | 03.02.2021 | LT | 03.02.2021 | LV | 03.02.2021 | MC | 03.02.2021 | PL | 03.02.2021 | RO | 03.02.2021 | RS | 03.02.2021 | SE | 03.02.2021 | SI | 03.02.2021 | SK | 03.02.2021 | SM | 03.02.2021 | BG | 03.05.2021 | NO | 03.05.2021 | GR | 04.05.2021 | IS | 03.06.2021 | PT | 04.06.2021 | [2023/37] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
AT | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 03.02.2021 | |
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2011184147 (KAMIYA NORIHO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-3,12-23,28-54,57,64,66-88* the whole document *; | [XDYI] - JEGER S. ET AL., "Site-Specific and stoichiometric Modification of Antibodies by Bacterial Transglutaminase", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (20101217), vol. 49, pages 9995 - 9997, XP002695029 [XD] 1-3,12-17,20-22,30-32,34-40,42-47,64,66-81 * Abstract, page 9995, Figure 1; page 9996. Supportive information pages 8, 30 and 31. * [Y] 33,41,42,48,83-88 [I] 18,19,49-54,57,82 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ANIE.201004243 | [XYI] - Jeger S., PhD Thesis, Site-specific conjugation of Tumour-Targeting Antibodies Using Transglutaminase, Zürich, ETH Zürich, (20090101), XP002695030 [X] 1-3,12-17,20-22,30-32,34-40,42-47,64,66-81 * Pages 51-85 * [Y] 33,41,42,48,83-88 [I] 18,19,49-54,57,82 | [X] - THOMAS L MINDT ET AL, "Modification of different IgG1 antibodies via glutamine and lysine using bacterial and human tissue transglutaminase", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1021/BC700306N, ISSN 1043-1802, (20080101), pages 271 - 278, (20071108), XP002676805 [X] 64,65 * Abstract; page 272 figure 1; page 274 Scheme 1; page 275 second column paragraphs 1-3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700306n | [Y] - KEYANG XU ET AL, "Characterization of intact antibodydrug conjugates from plasma/serum in vivo by affinity capture capillary liquid chromatographymass spectrometry", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 412, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2011.01.004, ISSN 0003-2697, (20110104), pages 56 - 66, (20110107), XP028173871 [Y] 83-88 * Abstract, page 58 Figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2011.01.004 | [Y] - C. WÄNGLER ET AL, "Antibody-Dendrimer Conjugates: The Number, Not the Size of the Dendrimers, Determines the Immunoreactivity", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20080401), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.1021/bc700308q, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 813 - 820, XP055020206 [Y] 33,41,42,48 * Abstract; page 815, figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700308q | [AD] - CHI-WANG LIN ET AL, "Transglutaminase-Catalyzed Site-Specific Conjugation of Small-Molecule Probes to Proteins in Vitro and on the Surface of Living Cells", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20060401), vol. 128, no. 14, doi:10.1021/ja0604111, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 4542 - 4543, XP055028216 [AD] 1-3,12-23,28-54,57,64,66-88 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0604111 | Examination | WO2008029281 | WO2012059882 | - F Lhospice ET AL, "Towards Homogenous ADCs : A new Site-Specific Antibody Conjugation using Bacterial Transglutaminase", (20130101), URL: https://innate-pharma.com/sites/default/files/homogenous_adcs_new_site-specific_conjugation_based_on_btg.pdf, (20180321), XP055461449 | - KYOJI TSUCHIKAMA ET AL, "Antibody-drug conjugates: recent advances in conjugation and linker chemistries", PROTEIN & CELL, Beijing, CN, (20161014), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s13238-016-0323-0, ISSN 1674-800X, pages 33 - 46, XP055461467 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13238-016-0323-0 | - PATRICK DENNLER ET AL, "Transglutaminase-Based Chemo-Enzymatic Conjugation Approach Yields Homogeneous Antibody-Drug Conjugates", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20140319), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1021/bc400574z, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 569 - 578, XP055118351 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc400574z | - SIMONE JEGER ET AL, "Site-Specific and stoichiometric Modification of Antibodies by Bacterial Transglutaminase", vol. 49, no. 51, doi:10.1002/ANIE.201004243, ISSN 1433-7851, (20101217), pages 9995 - 9997, ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/anie.201004243/pdf, (20101125), XP002695029 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ANIE.201004243 | - SIMONE JEGER, "Site-Specific Conjugation of Tumour-Targeting Antibodies Using Transglutaminase", no. DISS. ETH 18696, (20090101), pages 51 - 85, A DISSERTATION SUBMITTED TO ETH ZURICH FOR THE DEGREE OF DOCTOR OF SCIENCES, UNIVERSITY OF BASEL, URL: http://e-collection.library.ethz.ch/eserv/eth:650/eth-650-02.pdf, XP002695030 | - CHI-WANG LIN ET AL, "Transglutaminase-Catalyzed Site-Specific Conjugation of Small-Molecule Probes to Proteins in Vitro and on the Surface of Living Cells", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20060401), vol. 128, no. 14, doi:10.1021/ja0604111, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 4542 - 4543, XP055028216 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0604111 | - NORIHO KAMIYA ET AL, "Site-specific cross-linking of functional proteins by transglutamination", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, vol. 33, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0141-0229(03)00154-6, ISSN 0141-0229, (20030910), pages 492 - 496, (20030702), XP002725332 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(03)00154-6 | - J. Grünberg ET AL, "Bacterial transglutaminase (BTG): the better way for site-specific modification of therapeutic antibodies", PSI Scientific Report 2010, (20100101), pages 48 - 49, URL: https://www.psi.ch/info/MediaBoard/PSI_ScientificReport_2010.pdf, (20180321), XP055461477 | - Laurent Ducry ET AL, "Considerations of Linker Technologies", Drug Delivery in Oncology : From Basic Research to Cancer Therapy, Weinheim, Germany, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, (20111019), pages 355 - 374, doi:10.1002/9783527634057.ch12, ISBN 978-3-527-32823-9, XP055461496 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9783527634057.ch12 | - DANIELLE J. VUGTS ET AL, "Synthesis of Phosphine and Antibody-Azide Probes for in Vivo Staudinger Ligation in a Pretargeted Imaging and Therapy Approach", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20111019), vol. 22, no. 10, doi:10.1021/bc200298v, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 2072 - 2081, XP055461830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc200298v | by applicant | US252028 | US258286 | US262030 | US4741900 | US4816567 | WO9211018 | US5156956 | WO9222583 | WO9310102 | US5229275 | EP0555649 | US5252469 | WO9606931 | WO9622366 | US5565332 | US5567610 | US5573905 | US5731183 | US5736356 | WO9825929 | WO9902514 | WO9907692 | WO9958534 | WO9967252 | WO9967253 | WO0000485 | WO0001333 | EP0994915 | WO0037473 | DE19907588 | WO0049019 | WO0049020 | WO0049021 | WO0057874 | WO0066589 | WO0071521 | US6162963 | US6204388 | WO0127308 | WO0164650 | WO0170716 | WO0173103 | WO0181342 | WO0192255 | WO0208440 | WO0214323 | WO0230356 | WO0232844 | US6380394 | US6387927 | WO02080846 | WO02083180 | US2002161201 | JP2003199569 | WO03074053 | WO2004014919 | WO2004043493 | WO2005040219 | US2005238646 | US2005238649 | US2005256030 | US7090843 | WO2007008848 | WO2007008603 | EP1859811 | WO2009105969 | US7763736 | US7807619 | WO2010115630 | WO2011085523 | US2011184147 | WO2011120053 | US8133515 | WO2012041504 | - JOSTEN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2000), vol. 240, pages 47 - 54 | - MINDT ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM., (2008), vol. 19, pages 271 - 278 | - JEGER ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2010), vol. 49, pages 9995 - 9997 | - KAMIYA ET AL., ENZYME. MICROB. TECHNOL., (2003), vol. 33, pages 492 - 496 | - ILL ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (1997), vol. 10, pages 949 - 57 | - HOLLIGER; HUDSON, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1126 - 1136 | - EDELMAN, G.M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. USA, (1969), vol. 63, pages 78 - 85 | - CARILLO ET AL., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073 | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCL. ACID. RES., (1984), vol. 12, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - Antibody Purification Handbook | - JAKOBOVITZ, NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, page 255 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, page 544 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553 | - GRIFFITH ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - MORRISON ET AL., PNAS, (1984), page 6851 | - JONES, NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 522 | - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, page 593 | - VERHOEYEN, SCIENCE, vol. 239, page 1534 | - SAZINSKY ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2008), vol. 105, no. 51, pages 20167 - 20172 | - CARTER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 4431 - 4443 | - HO ET AL., GENE (AMST., (1989), vol. 77, pages 51 - 59 | - KUNKEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 82, page 488 | - LIU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 20252 - 20260 | - ITO ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 102, pages 67 - 70 | - VALLETTE ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 723 - 733 | - WELLS ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 34, pages 315 - 323 | - KAJIWARA ET AL., AM. J. CLIN. PATHOL., (2011), vol. 136, no. 1, pages 138 - 144 | - JEGER ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT., (2010), vol. 49, pages 9995 - 9997 | - HAY ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, page 2237 | - RODRIGUES ET AL., CHEMISTRY BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 2, page 223 | - AMSBERRY ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, page 5867 | - KINGSBURY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1984), vol. 27, page 1447 | - FOLK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, pages 3695 - 3700 | - LORAND, L. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, pages 1756 - 1765 | - MURTHY, S.N. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 22907 - 22911 | - LORAND, L.; GRAHAM, R.M., NAT. REV. MOL. CELL BIOL., (2003), vol. 4, pages 140 - 156 | - ANDO ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 53, pages 2613 - 2617 | - HAMBLETT ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 7063 - 7070 | - WAKANKAR ET AL., MABS, (2011), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 161 - 172 | - LYON ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (2012), vol. 502, pages 123 - 138 | - KAEMPFER, J GEN MICROBIOL, (1991), vol. 137, pages 1831 - 1892 | - MOL. PHARM., (2004), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 375 - 382 | - DORONINA ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CFIEM., (2006), vol. 17, pages 1 14 - 124 | - CHAPMAN, ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 54, pages 531 - 545 | - KNOGLER ET AL., CLIN CANER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 603 - 611 | - MAEDA ET AL., CANCER SCI., (2010), vol. 101, no. 1, pages 224 - 230 | - J. R. JUNUTULA ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2008), vol. 26, page 925 | - BRABEZ N. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 54, no. 20, pages 7375 - 7384 | - KUIL J. ET AL., ORGANIC AND BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 7, pages 4088 - 4094 | - SUZUKI ET AL., GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 12, pages 183 - 193 |