Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782472

EP2782472 - APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A PRODUCT TO THE EYELASHES OR EYEBROWS, COMPRISING INJECTION-MOULDED BRISTLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chanel Parfums Beauté
135 avenue Charles de Gaulle
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / MILESI, Frédéric
33 Boulevard de Reuilly
F-75012 Paris / FR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Potdevin, Emmanuel Eric
LLR
11 boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12810322.322.11.2012
WO2012FR52693
Priority number, dateFR2011006073624.11.2011         Original published format: FR 1160736
[2014/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076427
Date:30.05.2013
Language:FR
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782472
Date:01.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A46B3/00, A46B9/02
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:APPLIKATOR ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINES PRODUKTES AUF DIE WIMPERN ODER AUGENBRAUEN MIT SPRITZGUSSGEFORMTEN BORSTEN[2014/40]
English:APPLICATOR FOR APPLYING A PRODUCT TO THE EYELASHES OR EYEBROWS, COMPRISING INJECTION-MOULDED BRISTLES[2014/40]
French:APPLICATEUR POUR APPLIQUER UN PRODUIT SUR LES CILS OU LES SOURCILS QUI COMPREND DES POILS MOULES PAR INJECTION[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase20.05.2014National basic fee paid 
20.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
12.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]FR2903585  (ALCAN PACKAGING BEAUTY SERV [FR]) [X] 1-8,10,13,14 * page 21, lines 8-27 * * page 24, lines 1-9; figures 10-12,13-21,30-32 * [I] 11,12;
 [XI]US2010089414  (WYATT PETER JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13,14 * paragraphs [0071] - [0072]; figures 59A-D,61A-D * [I] 5,6,8,9;
 [XI]EP2332441  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-4,10,13,14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] , [0028] , [0000] , [0040] , [0041] , [0063] , [0076] , [0115] , [0133] , [0134] , [0138] , [0140] * * paragraph [0169]; figures 5,6,16,17,21,23 * [I] 8
by applicantWO2008091128