Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787858

EP2787858 - TOOTHBRUSH ALLOWING THE REAR FACES OF THE TEETH TO BE CLEANED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berchotteau, Raymond
4 rue de la Tonnelle
La Noue
17740 Sainte Marie De Re / FR
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Cabinet Chaillot
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12810357.906.12.2012
[2019/13]
WO2012FR52818
Priority number, dateFR2011006119206.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161192
[2014/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083922
Date:13.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787858
Date:15.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787858
Date:27.03.2019
Language:FR
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A46B5/00, A46B9/04
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZAHNBÜRSTE ZUR REINIGUNG DER ZAHNRÜCKSEITEN[2014/42]
English:TOOTHBRUSH ALLOWING THE REAR FACES OF THE TEETH TO BE CLEANED[2014/42]
French:BROSSE A DENTS PERMETTANT LE NETTOYAGE DES FACES ARRIERE DES DENTS[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
24.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2019Fee for grant paid
18.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
01.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]DE451111  (EUGEN GUENS) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [I]FR574577  (GRÜN J) [I] 1-5,7-10 * page 1, lines 15-20 * * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 6 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2004177463  (TAKEDA AKINOBU [JP]) [A] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0060] * * figures 5A, 12 *;
 [AD]US4150457  (LARSON DAVID F [US]) [AD] 1,3,4,7,9 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 37 * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [AD]JPH1146862  (RYU KENYO) [AD] 1,9,10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE920904  (BRUEHL ANTON DR MED) [A] 1,9,10 * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]JPH02243105  (SAKURAI SHIGEKATSU) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1 *;
 [A]US6286173  (BRIONES NICK WALTER ALCANTARA [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2440171  (DOLINSKY JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, lines 1-7 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 17 * * figures 1, 2 *
by applicantCN201178789Y
 US4150457
 JPH1146862
 DE20317004U