Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791715

EP2791715 - MIRROR COMPRISING A POLYMER BASED ADD-ON FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saint-Gobain Glass France
18, Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2019/23]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Saint-Gobain Glass France
18 avenue d' Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LAVAL, Philippe
26, Avenue Jeanne d'Arc
93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR
02 / RACHET, Vincent
146, Avenue Henri Ginoux
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2019/23]
Former [2014/43]01 / LAVAL, Philippe
26, Avenue Jeanne d'Arc
93600 Auinay Sous Bois / FR
02 / RACHET, Vincent
146 Avenue Henri Ginoux
F-92120 Montrouge / FR
Representative(s)Saint-Gobain Recherche
Département Propriété Industrielle
39 Quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Douysset, Laurence
Saint-Gobain Recherche
Propriété Industrielle
39, quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
Application number, filing date12810387.611.12.2012
WO2012FR52874
Priority number, dateFR2011006178716.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161787
[2014/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088055
Date:20.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791715
Date:22.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/10, G02B5/08, C03C17/38
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:SPIEGEL MIT POLYMERBASIERTER ZUSÄTZLICHER FOLIE[2014/43]
English:MIRROR COMPRISING A POLYMER BASED ADD-ON FILM[2014/43]
French:MIROIR COMPRENANT UN FILM RAPPORTÉ À BASE DE POLYMÈRE[2019/23]
Former [2014/43]MIROIR COMPRENANT UN FILM RAPPORTE A BASE DE POLYMERE
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
26.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5215832  (HUGHES ZEPHUREN J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-14 * column 1, line 54 - column 9, line 49 * * figures 2-4 * [I] 7,15;
 [A]WO2011037061  (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0248] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US6989924  (JORGENSEN GARY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 42 *;
 [A]US2004233530  (KRAMER TOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0091] * * figure 1 *
by applicantFR2936240
 US2009220685
 EP0882997
 WO2010001061