Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2850918

EP2850918 - WIRELESS LIGHT CONTROLLER SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lumenpulse Group Inc.
1220 Marie-Victorin Blvd.
Longueuil QC J4G 2H9 / CA
[2018/43]
Former [2015/13]For all designated states
Lumenpulse Lighting Inc.
268 Summer Street
Boston, Massachusetts 02210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Gregory
17 Joal Avenue
Walpole, Massachusetts 02081 / US
02 / SOUVAY, Francois-Xavier
663 Bosquet Street
Boucherville, Québec J4B 8V9 / CA
 [2015/13]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2015/13]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date12810489.012.12.2012
[2019/32]
WO2012US69322
Priority number, dateUS20121334426605.01.2012         Original published format: US201213344266
[2015/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103488
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2850918
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2015/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2850918
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H05B37/02
[2015/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES LICHTSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2015/13]
English:WIRELESS LIGHT CONTROLLER SYSTEM AND METHOD[2015/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE LUMIÈRE SANS FIL[2015/13]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2014National basic fee paid 
09.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/13]
11.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/13]
09.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/13]
27.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2019Fee for grant paid
25.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2018
Request for further processing for:09.10.2014Request for further processing filed
09.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
NO, FR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL, RO, PT, PL
09.10.2014Request for further processing filed
09.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
09.10.2014Request for further processing filed
09.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
09.10.2014Request for further processing filed
09.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2009103245  (TRI CONCEPT TECHNOLOGY LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2009251072  (BARNETT THOMAS ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0023] - [0028]; figures 6A,6B *;
 [I]WO2011094837  (YWIRE TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP0359178  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-20 * column 4, line 6 - column 9, line 46; figure 6 *;
 [I]KR101100228B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *