Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817304

EP2817304 - NOVEL COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE IN THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NeuroScios GmbH
Willersdorferstrasse 6
A-8061 St.Radegund/Graz / AT
[2016/29]
Former [2015/47]For all designated states
CPL BCX PHARMA AB
Karolinska Institutet Science Park
Tomtebodavägen 23 A
171 65 Solna / SE
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
BioChromix NewCo AB
Retzius väg 8
171 65 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ÅSBERG, Peter
Gambrinusgatan 6
112 31 Stockholm / SE
02 / HAMMER, Kristin
Kantorsgränd 11
192 72 Sollentuna / SE
03 / OLSSON, Johan
Svarvargatan 14
112 49 Stockholm / SE
04 / HENRIKSSON, Martin
Virebergsvägen 15
109 30 Solna / SE
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Brann AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12811201.813.07.2012
WO2012SE50837
Priority number, dateSE2011005068214.07.2011         Original published format: SE 1150682
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013009259
Date:17.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817304
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.01.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D409/14, A61K31/381, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, C07D333/18, C07D409/04, C07D409/10, C07D413/06
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:NEUE VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG[2015/01]
English:NOVEL COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE IN THERAPY[2015/01]
French:COMPOSÉS INÉDITS ET LEUR UTILISATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2014National basic fee paid 
14.02.2014Search fee paid 
14.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
22.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/07]
09.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]WO0244378  (CURIS INC [US], et al);
 [X]WO2010044743  (BIOCHROMIX PHARMA AB [SE], et al);
 [X]WO2004035570  (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al);
 [XP]WO2011102789  (OBOE IPR AB [SE], et al)
 [X]  - FAZIO, A. ET AL., "Synthesis of 3,4-bis[(methoxycarbonyl)methyl]thiophene and bis-, ter- and pentathiophenes with alternating 3,4- bis[(methoxycarbonyl)methyl]-substituted rings.", TETRAHEDRON, (19990801), vol. 55, no. 2, pages 485 - 502, XP055067205

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(98)01047-3
 [X]  - SCHROTH, W. ET AL., "1,2-Dithiines and precursors, XVI: Synthesis, structure, and reactivity of non-anellated 1,2-dithiines.", TETRAHEDRON, (19960923), vol. 52, no. 39, pages 12677 - 12698, XP055142744
 [X]  - BERG, I. ET AL., "P. Efficient imaging of amyloid deposits in Drosophila models of human amyloidoses.", NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2010), vol. 5, pages 935 - 944, XP055142747

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2010.41
 [X]  - BERTONCINI, C. W. ET AL., "Small Molecule Fluorescent Probes for the Detection of Amyloid Self-Assembly In Vitro and In Vivo.", CURRENT PROLEIN AND PEPTIDE SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 11, pages 206 - 220, XP008172959

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138920311795860151
 [X]  - HAMMARSTRÖM, P. ET AL., "A Fluorescent Pentameric Thiophene Derivative Detects in Vitro-Formed Prefibrillar Protein Aggregates.", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20100817), vol. 49, no. 32, pages 6838 - 6845, XP055142750

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi100922r
 [X]  - KLINGSTEDT, T. ET AL., "Synthesis of a library of oligothiophenes and their utilization as fluorescent ligands for spectral assignment of protein aggregates.", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 9, no. 24, pages 8356 - 8370, XP055079055

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1ob05637a
 [X]  - NILSSON, K. P. R. ET AL., "Structural Typing of Systemic Amyloidoses by Luminescent-Conjugated Polymer Spectroscopy.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (2010), vol. 176, no. 2, pages 563 - 574, XP055142753

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/ajpath.2010.080797
 [X]  - NILSSON, K. P. R. ET AL., "Imaging Distinct Conformational States of Amyloid-beta Fibrils in Alzheimer's Disease Using Novel Luminescent Probes.", ACS CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20070801), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 553 - 560, XP003026386
 [X]  - WIGENIUS, J. ET AL., "Interactions Between a Luminescent Conjugated Oligoelectrolyte and Insulin During Early Phases of Amyloid Formation.", MACROMOLECULAR BIOSCIENCE, (2011), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 1120 - 1127, XP055142754

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mabi.201100016
 [X]  - ASLUND, A. ET AL., "Novel Pentameric Thiophene Derivatives for in Vitro and in Vivo Optical Imaging of a Plethora of Protein Aggregates in Cerebral Amyloidoses.", ACS CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 673 - 684, XP009169366

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cb900112v
 [X]  - ASLUND, A. ET AL., "Studies of Luminescent Conjugated Polythiophene Derivatives: Enhanced Spectral Discrimination of Protein Conformational States.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20071101), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 1860 - 1868, XP055142755

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700180g