Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795155

EP2795155 - BELT HAVING A MULTILAYER IMPREGNATED TEXTILE OVERLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arntz Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG
Corveyer Allee 15
37671 Höxter / DE
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / GIBSON, Daniel Pattie
Waldweg 16
37671 Höxter / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[2016/06]
Former [2014/44]Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date12812170.417.12.2012
[2016/06]
WO2012EP05191
Priority number, dateDE20111012165620.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011121656
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013091808
Date:27.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795155
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795155
Date:10.02.2016
Language:DE
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16G1/08, F16G1/10, F16G1/28, F16G5/06, F16G5/10, F16G5/20
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RIEMEN MIT MEHRSCHICHTIG IMPRÄGNIERTER TEXTILAUFLAGE[2014/44]
English:BELT HAVING A MULTILAYER IMPREGNATED TEXTILE OVERLAY[2014/44]
French:COURROIE COMPRENANT UNE SURFACE D'APPUI MULTICOUCHE EN TEXTILE IMPRÉGNÉ[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
24.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2015Fee for grant paid
20.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2015
Opposition(s)11.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2012
AL10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
MT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU17.12.2012
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
MT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2018/43]HU17.12.2012
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
MT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2018/30]HU17.12.2012
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/16]CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/49]DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/46]DK10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
RS10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/38]FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Former [2016/35]FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[XAI]DE102010017782  (CONTITECH ANTRIEBSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0022] , [ 0024]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 1-7,11-18 [I] 9,10;
 [A]WO2005080820  (DAYCO EUROPE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1180615  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0014] *
by applicantDE102008055497
 US6296588
 WO03031700
 US2010120566
 DE3248776
 DE10212889