Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793587

EP2793587 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PARASITICIDAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solvay SA
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
[2015/42]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Solvay SA
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Inventor(s)01 / PASCAL, Jean-Philippe
Rue Charles Oudille, 39
54600 Villers Les Nancy / FR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Teipel, Stephan , et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[2015/42]
Former [2014/44]Vande Gucht, Anne , et al
Solvay S.A.
Intellectual Assets Management
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date12812226.419.12.2012
[2015/42]
WO2012EP76125
Priority number, dateFR2011006193719.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161937
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092694
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793587
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793587
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01N59/04, A01N59/00, A01N25/12, A01N25/04, A01P7/00, A01P3/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PARASITIZIDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2014/44]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PARASITICIDAL COMPOSITION[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION PARASITICIDE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
26.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2015Fee for grant paid
03.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2015
Opposition(s)15.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2012
AL14.10.2015
AT14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MK14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
TR14.10.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU19.12.2012
AT14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MK14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
TR14.10.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU19.12.2012
AT14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MK14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2017/39]HU19.12.2012
AT14.10.2015
BG14.10.2015
CY14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
MT14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SI14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/46]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/45]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
IE19.12.2015
LU19.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
DK14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
LU19.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/38]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
SM14.10.2015
LU19.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
EE14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RO14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
SK14.10.2015
LU19.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT14.10.2015
CZ14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
LU19.12.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/33]AT14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
MC14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
LV14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT14.10.2015
FI14.10.2015
HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
PL14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
GR15.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
PT15.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR14.10.2015
LT14.10.2015
RS14.10.2015
SE14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
IS14.02.2016
Former [2016/21]LT14.10.2015
NO14.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT14.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2006097480  (SOLVAY [BE]; PASCAL JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR]; PALANGIE NICOLAS [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2005025317  (SOLVAY [BE]; PALANGIE NICOLAS [IT]; PASCAL JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2006097504  (SOLVAY [BE]; PASCAL JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR]; PALANGIE NICOLAS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2007045608  (SOLVAY [BE]; PALANGIE NICOLAS [FR]; PASCAL JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantWO2006097480
 EP0352847
 WO2007004608