Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794005

EP2794005 - GANTRY STRUCTURE FOR A HADRON THERAPY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ION BEAM APPLICATIONS S.A.
Chemin du Cyclotron, 3
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2014/51]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Ion Beam Applications S.A.
Chemin due Cyclotron 3
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
Inventor(s)01 / AMÉLIA, Jean-Claude
Rue Albert 1er 43
6560 Erquelinnes / BE
 [2016/22]
Former [2014/44]01 / AMÉLIA, Jean-Claude
Rue Albert 1er 43
B-6560 Erquelinnes / BE
Representative(s)Van Malderen, Joëlle
pronovem - Office Van Malderen
Avenue Josse Goffin 158
1082 Bruxelles / BE
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12812262.921.12.2012
[2016/42]
WO2012EP76682
Priority number, dateEP2011019506521.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11195065
EP2012016739409.05.2012         Original published format: EP 12167394
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093020
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794005
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794005
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/10
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HADRONTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER KOMPAKTEN GANTRY-STRUKTUR[2016/19]
English:GANTRY STRUCTURE FOR A HADRON THERAPY APPARATUS[2014/44]
French:APPAREIL DE THÉRAPIE HADRON DOTÉ D'UNE STRUCTURE DE PORTIQUE COMPACTE[2016/21]
Former [2014/44]PORTALSTRUKTUR FÜR EINE HADRONTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNG
Former [2014/44]STRUCTURE DE PORTIQUE POUR UN APPAREIL D'HADRONTHÉRAPIE
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
18.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2016Fee for grant paid
07.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2015
Opposition(s)20.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
CY19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
TR19.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
MT21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]HU21.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
CY19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
MT21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2018/30]HU21.12.2012
AT19.10.2016
CY19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
MK19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/42]AT19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV19.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2058027  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0060]; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0986070  (SCHWERIONENFORSCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0057]; figure 6 *;
 [X]EP2308561  (ION BEAM APPLIC [BE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0035] *;
 [Y]US2007029510  (HERMANN KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4507616  (BLOSSER HENRY G [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 5; figure 1 *
by applicantEP2308561
 US2007029510
 EP2058027
 EP0986070
 US4507616