Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798921

EP2798921 - HOUSING FOR RECEIVING AN ELECTRONIC UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU, SK
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Strasse 17
42551 Velbert / DE
[2018/47]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Strasse 17
42551 Velbert / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NEUHOFF, Stefan
Honnschaftenstraße 23
45239 Essen / DE
02 / SCHINDLER, Justine
Warrington Platz 31
40721 Hilden / DE
 [2018/47]
Former [2014/45]01 / NEUHOFF, Stefan
Honnschaftenstraße 23
45239 Essen / DE
02 / SCHINDLER, Justine
Haubahn 20
42119 Wuppertal / DE
Representative(s)Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12812280.128.12.2012
[2018/47]
WO2012EP77029
Priority number, dateDE2011105719230.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011057192
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013098377
Date:04.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2798921
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798921
Date:21.11.2018
Language:DE
[2018/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H05K5/00
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEHÄUSE ZUR AUFNAHME EINER ELEKTRONIKEINHEIT[2014/45]
English:HOUSING FOR RECEIVING AN ELECTRONIC UNIT[2014/45]
French:BOÎTIER DESTINÉ À LOGER UNE UNITÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
14.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2018Fee for grant paid
08.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
LU28.12.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/37]AL21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/25]ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/24]ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/23]ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[XAI]DE102005007931  (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0020] * [A] 5,6,13,17-19 [I] 9,10,12,14-16,20,21;
 [A]US2006063401  (ARIGA KOHJI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-21 * figures 1-5 *