Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791804

EP2791804 - NETWORK- BASED TESTING AND PUBBLICATION SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synopsys, Inc.
690 East Middlefield Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2016/08]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Codenomicon Oy
Tutkijantie 4 E
90570 Oulu / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KORTTI, Heikki
Kangaspellontie 1 B 21
FI-00350 Helsinki / FI
02 / KAKSONEN, Rauli
Lumikkotie 4
FI-96900 Rovaniemi / FI
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Kolster Oy Ab
(Salmisaarenaukio 1)
P.O. Box 204
00181 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date12812286.804.12.2012
WO2012FI51206
Priority number, dateFI2011000627816.12.2011         Original published format: FI 20116278
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087982
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791804
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/36
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:NETWERKBASIERTE PRÜFUNG UND VERÖFFENTLICHUNGSDIENST[2014/43]
English:NETWORK- BASED TESTING AND PUBBLICATION SERVICE[2014/43]
French:SERVICE DE TEST ET DE PUBLICATION EN RÉSEAU[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
17.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2005229159  (HABA EREZ [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 2-11,13-25;
 [A]WO2007070414  (ARCHIVAS INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 7, line 11 - page 10, line 10 *