Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2795302 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2795302



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 202
21.09.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
28.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.09.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
28.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
17.07.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
18.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
13.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
06.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
06.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
06.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.12.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.12.2012 Annex International Searching Authority 2
04.12.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 3
04.12.2012 Description International Searching Authority 17
04.12.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 4