Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2795302


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
07.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
23.09.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.10.2016  [2016/43]
16.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
16.10.2015 (Expected) grant published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
02.10.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.10.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.10.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication