Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795302

EP2795302 - METHOD OF FABRICATING A MONITORING HEAD OF A NONDESTRUCTIVE MONITORING SENSOR BASED ON EDDY CURRENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
Bâtiment le Ponant D
25 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / DECITRE, Jean-Marc
81 rue Alfred Dubois
F-91460 Marcoussis / FR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Bonnet, Michel
Cabinet Bonnet
93, rue Réaumur - Boîte 10
75002 Paris / FR
[2015/47]
Former [2014/44]Bonnet, Michel
Cabinet Bonnet 93, Rue Réaumur - Boîte 10
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12812291.804.12.2012
[2015/47]
WO2012FR52797
Priority number, dateFR2011006234222.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1162342
[2014/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093278
Date:27.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795302
Date:29.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795302
Date:18.11.2015
Language:FR
[2015/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ÜBERWACHUNGSKOPFES EINES ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN ÜBERWACHUNGSSENSORS AUF DER BASIS VON WIRBELSTRÖMEN[2014/44]
English:METHOD OF FABRICATING A MONITORING HEAD OF A NONDESTRUCTIVE MONITORING SENSOR BASED ON EDDY CURRENTS[2014/44]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE TETE DE CONTROLE D'UN CAPTEUR DE CONTROLE NON DESTRUCTIF A COURANTS DE FOUCAULT[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
17.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2015Fee for grant paid
28.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2015
Opposition(s)19.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2012
AL18.11.2015
AT18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
TR18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU04.12.2012
AT18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
TR18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU04.12.2012
AT18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/02]HU04.12.2012
AT18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
LU04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/39]HU04.12.2012
AT18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/46]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/45]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE04.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/42]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/22]LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
Former [2016/20]LT18.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]US6310476  (KAWANAMI SEIICHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-10 * column 1, lines 61-64 * * column 2, lines 1-7,53-58 * * column 3, lines 1-22 * * column 5, lines 26-57; figures 1,13 *;
 [AD]FR2881826  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * page 4, lines 8-16 * * page 8, line 33 - page 10, line 3 *;
 [AD]FR2904694  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 27 * * page 6, lines 13-16; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP2056103  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - WILLIAM F AVRIN, "Eddy current measurements with magneto-resistive sensors: Third-layer flaw detection in a wing-splice structure 25 mm thick", NONDESTRUCTIVE EVALUATION OF AGING AIRCRAFT, AIRPORTS AND AEROSPACE HARDWARE IV, (20000101), vol. 3994, pages 29 - 36, XP055032845 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.385032
by applicantFR2881827
 US6310476
 FR2904694
 FR2904693