Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800538

EP2800538 - DENTAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kulzer GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 2
63450 Hanau / DE
[2017/39]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH
Grüner Weg 11
63450 Hanau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WOLDEGERGIS, Yohannes
Patershäuser Str. 1
63457 Hanau / DE
02 / BAUER, Christian
Ziegelhütte 74
63825 Westerngrund / DE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Bendele, Tanja , et al
RUHR-IP Patentanwälte
Brucker Holt 58
45133 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/32]Bendele, Tanja , et al
RUHR -IP Patentanwälte
Brucker Holt 58
45133 Essen / DE
Former [2014/46]Bendele, Tanja , et al
RUHR-IP Patentanwälte
Postfach 23 01 44
45069 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date12812522.612.12.2012
[2017/32]
WO2012EP05122
Priority number, dateDE2012100013606.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012000136
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102474
Date:11.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800538
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800538
Date:09.08.2017
Language:DE
[2017/32]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2800538
Date:15.11.2017
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DENTALIMPLANTAT[2014/46]
English:DENTAL IMPLANT[2014/46]
French:IMPLANT DENTAIRE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2014National basic fee paid 
04.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
16.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2017Fee for grant paid
29.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2017
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
AT12.12.2017
GB12.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2018/50]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
GB12.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/49]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/45]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]DE10201817  (BIELINA ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 6-12 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-7 *;
 [AD]DE10358680  (NEUMEYER STEFAN [DE]) [AD] 6-12 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-4 *
ExaminationDE202004016896U
by applicantDE10358680