Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791683

EP2791683 - BIOMARKERS AND PARAMETERS FOR PREECLAMPSIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mycartis N.V.
Technologiepark 4
9052 Gent / BE
[2017/46]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Mycartis N.V.
Technologiepark 4
9052 Gent / BE
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Pronota NV
Technologiepark 4
9052 Zwijnaarde / BE
Inventor(s)01 / THOMAS, Gregoire
Van Duysestraat 42
B-9160 Lokeren / BE
02 / TUYTTEN, Robin
Snugboro
Glanmire Village, Glanmire, Co. Cork / IE
03 / MOERMAN, Piet
Pontstraat 87
B-9831 Deurle / BE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Denjean, Eric
Cabinet Laurent et Charras
Le Contemporain
50, chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly / FR
[2017/46]
Former [2014/43]Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
Application number, filing date12812560.614.12.2012
[2017/46]
WO2012EP75643
Priority number, dateEP2011019384715.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11193847
US201161576273P15.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161576273 P
EP2012016895522.05.2012         Original published format: EP 12168955
US201261650145P22.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261650145 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013087887
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2791683
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2791683
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIOMARKER UND PARAMETER FÜR PRÄEKLAMPSIE[2014/43]
English:BIOMARKERS AND PARAMETERS FOR PREECLAMPSIA[2014/43]
French:BIOMARQUEURS ET PARAMÈTRES POUR PRÉ-ÉCLAMPSIE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
25.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2017Fee for grant paid
03.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2015
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.04.2016Request for further processing filed
04.04.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.04.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201504   M06   Fee paid on   04.04.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2012
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
MK15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
MT14.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/31]HU14.12.2012
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
MT14.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2019/30]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
MT14.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
MT14.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE14.12.2017
LU14.12.2017
MT14.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU14.12.2017
MT14.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO2011128357  (PRONOTA NV [BE], et al) [XD] 1,18,20-23 * claims; Figure 1 *;
 [Y]KR20100088217  (UNIV KONKUK IND COOP CORP [KR]) [Y] 1,18,20-23 * abstract *;
 [XY]WO2004008946  (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 23 * claims 34-38; abstract * [Y] 1,18,20-22;
 [XDY]WO2009094665  (PERKINELMER HEALTH SCI INC [US], et al) [XD] 23 * claims ; abstract; page 19, last paragraph-page 20, paragraph 4 * [Y] 1,18,20-22;
 [XY]WO2010059952  (PERKINELMER HEALTH SCI INC [US], et al) [X] 23 * claims, abstract * [Y] 1,18,20-22;
 [Y]  - JISOOK PARK ET AL, "Discovery of the serum biomarker proteins in severe preeclampsia by proteomic analysis", EXPERIMENTAL AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (20110101), vol. 43, no. 7, doi:10.3858/emm.2011.43.7.047, ISSN 1226-3613, page 427, XP055019907 [Y] 1,18,20-23 * abstract; figures 3; discussion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3858/emm.2011.43.7.047
 [Y]  - ROHRA, "Biochemical screening for the prediction of preeclampsia", JOURNAL OF THE PAKISTAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (20050101), vol. 55, no. 2, ISSN 0030-9982, page 79, XP055045761 [Y] 1,18,20-23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KAAJA R, "Predictors and risk factors of pre-eclampsia", MINERVA GINECOLOGICA, TORINO, IT, (20081001), vol. 60, no. 5, ISSN 0026-4784, pages 421 - 429, XP009156780 [A] 1,18,20-23 * abstract; table 2; paragraph "biochemical predictors of pre-eclampsia" *
 [A]  - LEWITT ET AL, "Regulation of insulin-like growth factor-binding protein-3 ternary complex formation in pregnancy", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19981101), vol. 159, no. 2, doi:10.1677/joe.0.1590265, ISSN 0022-0795, pages 265 - 274, XP055001958 [A] 1,18,20-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/joe.0.1590265
by applicantWO2009094665
 WO2011128357
 WO2009097584
 WO2009108073
 US2006105415
 US4816567
 US5270163
 US5578577
 US5141850
 US4775636
 US4853335
 US4859612
 US5079172
 US5202267
 US5514602
 US5616467
 US5681775
 US6107045
 US6974706
 US5108889
 US6027944
 US6482156
 US6511814
 US5824268
 US5726010
 US6001658
 US2008090305
 US2003109067
    - SOLOMON; SEELY, ENDOCRINOL METAB CLIN NORTH AM, (2006), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 157 - 71,VII
    - SIBAI; BARTON, AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (2007), vol. 196, no. 6
    - ROBERTS ET AL., HYPERTENSION, (2003), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 37 - 45
    - CONDE-AGUDELO ET AL., OBSTET GYNECOL, (2004), vol. 104, pages 1367 - 91
    - LEWITT ET AL., JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1998), vol. 159, page 265
    - MISTRY ET AL., HYPERTENSION, (2008), vol. 52, page 881
    - RAYMAN ET AL., AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (2003), vol. 189, page 1343
    - BUJOLD ET AL., OBSTET GYNECOL, (2010), vol. 116, pages 402 - 14
    - MAYNARD ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (2003), vol. 111, no. 5, pages 649 - 58
    - POLLIOTTI ET AL., OBSTET GYNECOL, (2003), vol. 101, pages 1266 - 74
    - ALBERTI ET AL., DIABETIC MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 23, pages 469 - 480
    - LANCET, vol. 366, pages 1059 - 1062
    - CRUZ ET AL., "Applications of Machine Learning in Cancer Prediction and Prognosis", CANCER INFORMATICS, (2007), vol. 2, pages 59 - 77
    - LOWRY ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1951), vol. 193, page 265
    - HARTREE, ANAL BIOCHEM, (1972), vol. 48, pages 422 - 427
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - MARKS ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - "Antibody Engineering: Methods and Protocols", LO,, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2004), vol. 248
    - ELLINGTON; SZOSTAK, NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 818 - 822
    - TUERK; GOLD, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 505 - 510
    - HORWELL, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 13, pages 132 - 134
    - G. FRENS, 1973 NATURE PHYSICAL SCIENCE, (1973), vol. 241, page 20
    - NIELSEN; GEIERSTANGER, J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2004), vol. 290, pages 107 - 20
    - LING ET AL., EXPERT REV MOL DIAGN, (2007), vol. 7, pages 87 - 98
    - "Mass Spectrometry of Proteins and Peptides", CHAPMAN,, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2000), vol. 146
    - BIEMANN, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 193, pages 455 - 79
    - "Biological Mass Spectrometry", BURLINGAME,, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2005), vol. 402
    - KUHN ET AL., PROTEOMICS, (2004), vol. 4, pages 1175 - 86
    - ZHONG ET AL., PRENATAL DIAGNOSIS, (2010), vol. 30, pages 293 - 308
    - ROYSTON ET AL., "Prognosis and prognostic research: Developing a prognostic model", BMJ 2009, (2009), vol. 338, page B604
    - TIBSHIRANI, "Regression shrinkage and selection via the lasso", J. ROYAL. STATIST. SOC B., (1996), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 267 - 288
    - BMJ, (2011), vol. 342, page D1875