Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794764

EP2794764 - HIGH-DENSITY FLUORESCENT DYE CLUSTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.11.2016  [2016/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MCCLOSKEY, Patrick, Joseph
GE Global Research
One Research Circle
Niskayuna, New York 12309-1027 / US
02 / JAIN, Sumeet
GE Global Research
One Research Circle
Niskayuna, New York 12309-1027 / US
03 / NATARAJAN, Arunkumar
GE Global Research
One Research Circle
Niskayuna, New York 12309-1027 / US
04 / BURNS, Andrew, Arthur, Paul
GE Global Research
One Research Circle
Niskayuna, New York 12309-1027 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Aldenbäck, Ulla Christina , et al
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30
751 84 Uppsala / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Bryan, Ian Bennett
GE Healthcare Limited
Pollards Wood
Nightingales Lane
Chalfont St Giles, Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB
Application number, filing date12812612.519.12.2012
WO2012EP76248
Priority number, dateUS20111333637623.12.2011         Original published format: US201113336376
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092774
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794764
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09B69/00, C09B69/10, G01N33/533, G01N33/58
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:HOCHDICHTE FLUORESZENZFARBSTOFF-CLUSTER[2014/44]
English:HIGH-DENSITY FLUORESCENT DYE CLUSTERS[2014/44]
French:GROUPES DE COLORANTS FLUORESCENTS À HAUTE DENSITÉ[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2014National basic fee paid 
06.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/48]
27.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2009078970  (BIOTIUM INC [US]; MAO FEI [US]; LEUNG WAI-YEE [US]; CHEUNG CHING-YING) [X] 1-4,7-11,16-18,20-24,27,28 * page 8 * * table - * [Y] 12-15;
 [XY]EP0513560  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-11,16-18,20-24,27,28 * page 7, line 11 - line 19 * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 4 * [Y] 12-15;
 [XY]US6060598  (DEVLIN ROBERT FRANCIS [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,7-11,16-18,20-24,27,28 * figures 10,27-33 * [Y] 12-15;
 [Y]EP2366785  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [Y] 12-15 * paragraph [0007] * * figure - *
by applicant   - Y. HONG; J. LAM; B. Z. TANG, "Aggregation-Induced Emission: Phenomenon, Mechanism and Applications", CHEMCOMM, (2009), pages 4332 - 4353
    - C-T LAI; J-L. HONG, "Aggregation Induced Emission in Tetraphenylthiophene-derived organic molecules and vinyl polymer", J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2010), vol. 114, pages 10302 - 10310
    - A. QIN ET AL., "Luminogenic polymers with aggregation-induced emission characteristics", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2011.08.002, pages 182 - 209, XP028334455

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2011.08.002
    - J. ORG. CHERN., (2005), vol. 70, page 3765