EP2797859 - OXYGENATE-TO-OLEFINS PROCESS AND AN APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMESH, Rajaram Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
VAN WESTRENEN, Jeroen Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. LSI PO Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 12812662.0 | 21.12.2012 | WO2012EP76849 | Priority number, date | EP20110195905 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11195905 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013098273 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797859 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/20, C07C7/148, C07C11/04, C07C11/06, C07C11/08, C07C11/10, C07C11/107, B01J19/00 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C07C1/20 (EP,US);
C07C7/11 (US);
C07C1/22 (US);
C07C7/005 (US);
C07C7/152 (EP,US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C11/02 (EP,US);
C07C7/152, C07C11/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | OXYGENAT-ZU-OLEFINEN-VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2014/45] | English: | OXYGENATE-TO-OLEFINS PROCESS AND AN APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2014/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFORMATION DE COMPOSÉS OXYGÉNÉS EN OLÉFINES ET APPAREIL POUR CELUI-CI | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 10.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9926937 (HUNTSMAN SPEC CHEM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-13* figure 1 *; | [XY]US2003199722 (LATTNER JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0022] , [0121]; figure .; claim 14 * [Y] 1-13; | [YD]WO2007111744 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [YD] 1-13 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2008039552 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0033] , [0040] , [0041] , [0042]; figure 1; claims 1,4 * | by applicant | US4567029 | WO2006020083 | US2007155999 | US2007203380 | WO2007111744 |