Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805338

EP2805338 - WIDEBAND MULTILAYER TRANSMISSION LINE TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES, FI, LT, NO
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WYVILLE Mark
2061 Lenester Ave
Ottawa K2A 1K6 / CA
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Former [2014/48]Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12812721.415.11.2012
[2019/16]
WO2012IB56466
Priority number, dateUS20121335106216.01.2012         Original published format: US201213351062
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108093
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805338
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805338
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01F19/04, H01P5/02, H01P5/10, H03H7/42
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGE, WEITBANDIGE LEITUNGSÜBERTRAGER[2019/01]
English:WIDEBAND MULTILAYER TRANSMISSION LINE TRANSFORMER[2014/48]
French:TRANSFORMATEUR DE LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION À MULTICOUCHES[2019/01]
Former [2014/48]MEHRSCHICHTIGER BREITBANDIGER ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITERWANDLER
Former [2014/48]TRANSFORMATEUR DE LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION MULTICOUCHE À LARGE BANDE
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
12.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2019Fee for grant paid
07.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES17.04.2019
FI17.04.2019
LT17.04.2019
NL17.04.2019
NO17.07.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/44]NL17.04.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]GB1440304  (MULLARD LTD) [X] 1,4,7-12,17 * page 1, line 5 - line 32 * * page 6, line 10 - line 29; figures 8,9 * [Y] 2,3,13-15,18,19 [I] 6,16;
 [XYI]JP2002033216  (TDK CORP) [X] 1,4,8-12,17,20 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,3,13-15,18,19 [I] 6,16;
 [XY]US5420558  (ITO NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 16 * column 9, line 38 - column 11, line 41 * * column 13, line 5 - line 31 * * figures 2A, 2B, 3, 4 * [Y] 2,3,13-15,18,19;
 [XYI]US6396362  (MOURANT JEAN-MARC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-12 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 29; figures 4A, 4B, 8, 9 * [Y] 2,3,13-15 [I] 6;
 [XYI]WO2005027156  (SOUTH BANK UNIV ENTPR LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-12 * page 15, line 11 - page 17, line 27 * * figures 5-11 * [Y] 2,3,13-15 [I] 6
ExaminationWO2011008866