Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787911

EP2787911 - REDUCED COMPONENT BONE PLATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOMET C.V.
57/63 Line Wall Road
Gibraltar / GI
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / KORTENBACH, Juergen A.
122 Pinecrest Drive
Miami Springs
Florida 33166 / US
02 / SIXTO, JR., Robert
8235 SW 99 Street
Miami
Florida 33156 / US
03 / SUAREZ, Andrea
1111 SW 126th Place
Miami
Florida 33184 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/33]
Former [2014/42]Giles, Ashley Simon
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date12812761.003.12.2012
[2016/33]
WO2012US67558
Priority number, dateUS20111331335007.12.2011         Original published format: US201113313350
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085835
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787911
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787911
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80, A61B17/86
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KNOCHENPLATTENSYSTEM MIT VERRINGERTER KOMPONENTENZAHL[2014/42]
English:REDUCED COMPONENT BONE PLATING SYSTEM[2014/42]
French:SYSTÈME DE PLACAGE OSSEUX À COMPOSANT RÉDUIT[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
01.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2016Fee for grant paid
04.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16184396.6  / EP3207887
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.04.2015
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2012
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
LU03.12.2016
MT03.12.2016
PT19.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU03.12.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
LU03.12.2016
MT03.12.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU03.12.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
LU03.12.2016
MT03.12.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU03.12.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
LU03.12.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
LU03.12.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/45]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2008132960  (WEAVER PAUL C [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-6 * * figures 9,10 *;
 [A]EP2389884  (STRYKER TRAUMA SA [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0041]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2011295325  (WAGNER MICHAEL [AT], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2009312803  (AUSTIN GENE E [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0059]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102]; figures 31,32 *
by applicantUS2010069969