Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791810

EP2791810 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SENDING DATA VIA A PLURALITY OF DATA LINES ON A BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / GRUBER, Hans Georg
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / HARIHARAN, Magesh
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / ARCEO, Julio
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / MOHAN, Suren
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
05 / BALATSOS, Aris
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2016/46]
Former [2014/43]Roche, Dermot , et al
Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date12812774.314.12.2012
[2016/46]
WO2012US69800
Priority number, dateUS201161576840P16.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161576840 P
US20121371414013.12.2012         Original published format: US201213714140
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013090752
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791810
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2791810
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON DATEN ÜBER MEHRERE DATENLEITUNGEN AUF EINEM BUS[2014/43]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SENDING DATA VIA A PLURALITY OF DATA LINES ON A BUS[2014/43]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI DE DONNÉES PAR UNE PLURALITÉ DE LIGNES DE DONNÉES SUR UN BUS[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
12.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2016Fee for grant paid
06.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2015
Opposition(s)17.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2012
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IS16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
MK16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
TR16.11.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]HU14.12.2012
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IS16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
MK16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/30]HU14.12.2012
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IS16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
MK16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/49]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV16.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6275498  (BISCEGLIA BRIAN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-40 * column 2, line 3 - line 17 * * figure 5 *
 [Y]  - BACKMAN JUHA ET AL, "Slimbus: An Audio, Data And Control Interface For Mobile Devices", CONFERENCE: 29TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE: AUDIO FOR MOBILE AND HANDHELD DEVICES; SEPTEMBER 2006, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20060901), XP040507958 [Y] 1-40 * page 5 * * figures 4,5,6,7 *
ExaminationUS2010189112
 US2009248978