EP2791727 - LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A MIXING LIGHT GUIDE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLPI AG Wiesenstrasse 33 8952 Schlieren / CH | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENNY, Reinhard Rebbergstrasse 76 CH-5408 Ennetbaden / CH | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Alder, Hans Rudi Seifert & Partner Pestalozzistrasse 2 Postfach 248 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Alder, Hans Rudi Seifert & Partner Pestalozzistrasse 2 Postfach 1416 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 12812817.0 | 12.12.2012 | WO2012CH00272 | Priority number, date | CH20110001964 | 12.12.2011 Original published format: CH 19642011 | [2014/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013086645 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791727 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/09, G02B19/00, G02B6/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/0006 (EP,US);
F21K9/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM MISCHENDEN LICHTLEITKÖRPER | [2014/43] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A MIXING LIGHT GUIDE BODY | [2014/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPRENANT UN CORPS CONDUCTEUR ET MÉLANGEUR DE LUMIÈRE | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2020 | 26.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | 04.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2018 | Request for further processing for: | 12.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002051367 (HOOKER BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] *; | [X]US2006061989 (HOLDER RONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] ** paragraph [0047] * |