Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786076

EP2786076 - PHASE CHANGE MATERIAL PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VKR Holding A/S
Breeltevej 18
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Bako-Biro, Zsolt
54 Fullbrook Crescent
Tilehurst Reading RG31 6RY / GB
02 / Holloway, Mathew
57 Woodfield Park Road
Emsworth PO10 8BE / GB
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Dixon, Philip Matthew
HGF Limited
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12812880.803.12.2012
[2016/12]
WO2012EP74293
Priority number, dateGB2011002078402.12.2011         Original published format: GB 201120784
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013079728
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2786076
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786076
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F24F5/00, F28D20/02, F24F13/30
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/41]F24F5/00, F24F13/30, F28F3/04, F28F3/08, F28D20/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHASENWECHSELMATERIAL-STAPEL[2015/32]
English:PHASE CHANGE MATERIAL PACK[2014/41]
French:ENSEMBLE MATÉRIAU À CHANGEMENT DE PHASE[2014/41]
Former [2014/41]PHASENWECHSELMATERIALPAKET
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
21.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2016Fee for grant paid
21.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.09.2015
Opposition(s)02.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2012
AL23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
LU03.12.2016
MT03.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU03.12.2012
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
LU03.12.2016
MT03.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU03.12.2012
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
LU03.12.2016
MT03.12.2016
Former [2018/34]HU03.12.2012
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
LU03.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU03.12.2012
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
LU03.12.2016
Former [2017/49]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
LU03.12.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2010092393  (ARTICA TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]; HOLLOWAY MATHEW [GB]; TORLEI KARINA [GB]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0942239  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *
by applicantWO2009101398
 WO2010092391
 WO2010092393