Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803042

EP2803042 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING LIGHT SCATTERING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.07.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GAUTRON, Pascal
Technicolor R&d France
975 Avenue des Champs Blancs
F-35576 Cesson Sevigne Cedex / FR
02 / DELALANDRE, Cyril
Technicolor R&d France
975 Avenue Des Champs Blancs
F-35576 Cesson Sevigne Cedex / FR
03 / MARVIE, Jean-Eudes
Technicolor R&d France
975 Avenue Des Champs Blancs
F-35576 Cesson Sevigne Cedec / FR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date12812927.717.12.2012
WO2012EP75804
Priority number, dateEP2012030502810.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12305028
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104493
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803042
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/50, G06T15/06
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG EINER LICHTSTREUUNG[2014/47]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING LIGHT SCATTERING[2014/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ESTIMER LA DISPERSION DE LA LUMIÈRE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
26.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/32]
05.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2012000847  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]; DELALANDRE CYRIL [FR]; GAUTRON PASCAL [FR]; MA) [ID] 1-14 * page 4, line 19 - page 10, line 9 *;
 [A]WO2011057997  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]; DELALANDRE CYRIL [FR]; GAUTRON PASCAL [FR]; MA) [A] 1-14 * page 8, line 35 - page 9, line 2 *;
 [A]  - KLAFTER R D, "On the numerical integration of discontinuous functions", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON EDUCATION USA, (197007), vol. e-13, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9359, pages 48 - 50, XP002696641 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TE.1970.4320548
 [A]  - GELB A ET AL, "Robust reprojection methods for the resolution of the Gibbs phenomenon", APPLIED AND COMPUTATIONAL HARMONIC ANALYSIS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, US, vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ACHA.2004.12.007, ISSN 1063-5203, (2006), pages 3 - 25, (20060101), XP024917076 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.acha.2004.12.007
 [A]  - ANNEN T ET AL, "Real-time, all-frequency shadows in dynamic scenes", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS ACM USA, (200808), vol. 27, no. 3, ISSN 0730-0301, XP002696642 [A] 1-14 * section 3.3 and 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1360612.1360633
by applicantWO2009003143
 WO2012000847