Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797693

EP2797693 - PROCESS FOR THE REGENERATION OF AN IONIC LIQUID CATALYST AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]PROCESS FOR REGENERATION OF IONIC LIQUID CATALYST
[2018/45]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR The Hague / NL
[2018/13]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR The Hague / NL
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Rui
State Key Laboratory of Heavy Oil Processing
China University of Petroleum
Fuxue Road 18
Changping
Beijing 102249 / CN
02 / LIU, Zhichang
State Key Laboratory of Heavy Oil Processing
China University of Petroleum
Fuxue Road 18
Changping
Beijing 102249 / CN
03 / XU, Chunming
State Key Laboratory of Heavy Oil Processing
China University of Petroleum
Fuxue Road 18
Changping
Beijing 102249 / CN
04 / MENG, Xianghai
State Key Laboratory of Heavy Oil Processing
China University of Petroleum
Fuxue Road 18
Changping
Beijing 102249 / CN
05 / KLUSENER, Peter Anton August
Grasweg 31
NL-1031 HW Amsterdam / NL
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Shell Legal Services IP
p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Matthezing, Robert Maarten
Shell International B.V.
LSI
PO Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date12813054.928.12.2012
WO2012EP77082
Priority number, dateWO2011CN8496530.12.2011         Original published format: PCT/CN2011/084965
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098407
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797693
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J31/30, B01J31/40, C07C2/58, C07C9/12, C10G50/00, B01J31/02
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERIERUNG EINES IONISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSKATALYSATORS UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG[2018/45]
English:PROCESS FOR THE REGENERATION OF AN IONIC LIQUID CATALYST AND ITS USE[2018/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGÉNÉRATION D'UN CATALYSEUR LIQUIDE IONIQUE ET SON UTILISATION[2018/45]
Former [2014/45]VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERIERUNG EINES IONISCHEN FLÜSSIGKATALYSATORS
Former [2014/45]PROCESS FOR REGENERATION OF IONIC LIQUID CATALYST
Former [2014/45]PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGÉNÉRATION D'UN CATALYSEUR LIQUIDE IONIQUE
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
11.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/36]
15.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO2011015639  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]; UNIV CHINA PETROLEUM [CN]; LIU ZHICHANG [CN];) [XD] 1-6,8,10 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 1, line 10 - line 18 * * page 1, line 25 - line 30 * * page 2, line 1 - line 30 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 23 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 11 - page 10, line 23 * * page 12, line 11 - line 14 * * figure 1 * * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]US2007142213  (ELOMARI SALEH [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * examples 5, 6, 8, 9 * * claims 1-17 *
by applicantUS7285698
 WO2011015639
 WO2011015636
    - L.F. ALBRIGHT, IND. ENG. RES., (2009), vol. 48, page 1409
    - A. CORMA; A. MARTINEZ, CATAL. REV., (1993), vol. 35, page 483
    - CATAL. REV., (1993), vol. 35, page 483
    - OIL & GAS J., (2006), vol. 104, no. 40, pages 52 - 56
    - OIL&GAS J., (2006), vol. 104, no. 40, pages 52 - 56
    - C.P. HUANG ET AL., APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, (2004), vol. 277, pages 41 - 43