Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795608

EP2795608 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING MULTIPLE LEVELS OF INTERACTION WITH A PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / PARETTI, Christopher
394 Laidley Street
San Francisco, California 94131 / US
02 / REED, Amber
851 Ashbury Street
San Francisco, California 94117 / US
03 / LINDMEIER, William
1387 Hayes Street Apt 3
San Francisco, California 94117 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12813062.218.12.2012
WO2012FI51253
Priority number, dateUS20111333195520.12.2011         Original published format: US201113331955
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093190
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795608
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/14, G06F3/0481
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VERSCHIEDENER EBENEN ZUR INTERAKTION MIT EINEM PROGRAMM[2014/44]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING MULTIPLE LEVELS OF INTERACTION WITH A PROGRAM[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR FOURNIR À DE MULTIPLES NIVEAUX D'INTERACTION UN PROGRAMME[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
06.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US7702568  (TANPOCO ALVIN F [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * column 12, line 14 - line 54; figure 6 * [I] 2-7,9-14,16-20;
 [I]  - Supratim Nayak ET AL, "Photofold", (20110723), URL: http://dribbble.com/shots/324781-Photofold, (20130211), XP055052921 [I] 1,8,15 * the whole document *